Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11546

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-11550
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2015
Terminated:Aug 26, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Corporate Resource Development, Inc.
160 Broadway Fl 13
New York, NY 10038-4201
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 08/26 11:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (NAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
9 9 order Order Mon 07/27 3:32 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating all the jointly administered cases: Accountabilities, Inc., Case No. 15-11547 (MFW); Corporate Resource Development Inc., Case No. 15-11550 (MFW); Diamond Staffing Services, Inc., Case No. 15-11552 (MFW), Insurance Overload Services, Inc., Case No. 15-11548 (MFW); Integrated Consulting Services, Inc., Case No. 15-11549 (MFW); The CRS Group, Inc., Case No. 15-11551 (MFW); TS Staffing Services, Inc., Case No. 15-11553 (MFW) with the case of Corporate Resource Services, Inc., Case No. 15-11546 (MFW) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 15-11546 shall be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order signed on 7/27/15 (SJS) (Modified Text on 7/28/2015 (JohnstonJ, Julie). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2015 (NAL).
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 07/27 2:01 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Corporate Resource Development, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 07/27 2:00 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch C, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Corporate Resource Development, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
6 6 misc Amended Petition Fri 07/24 3:58 PM
Amended Petition to Add Complete EIN Related [+] Filed by Corporate Resource Development, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 court Case Reassigned Fri 07/24 9:32 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (Bonnie)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Case Reassigned Fri 07/24 8:28 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (Bonnie)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 07/24 8:08 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Thu 07/23 8:55 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Accountabilities, Inc., Corporate Resource Development, Inc., Corporate Resource Services, Inc., Diamond Staffing Services, Inc., Insurance Overload Services, Inc., Integrated Consulting Services, Inc., TS Staffing Services, Inc., The CRS Group, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 07/23 8:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11550 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7659285, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 07/23 8:01 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Corporate Resource Development, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]