Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-11546
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2015
Terminated:Aug 26, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Corporate Resource Services, Inc.
160 Broadway Fl 13
New York, NY 10038-4201
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


1. Corporate Resource Services Files for Bankruptcy (bankruptcynews.dowjones.com)
Submitted Mon 07/27/2015
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
116 116 notice Receipt of Record - Notice Wed 08/26 11:11 AM
Notice of Receipt of Record from Southern District of New York. New Bankruptcy Case Numbers 15-12329 through 15-12336 Related [+] Filed by (NAL)
Related: [-] 113
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 08/26 11:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (NAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
115 115 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 08/19 8:05 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 20, 2015 at 12:30 P.M. (ET) [Docket No. 112] . Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. Related [+] (Osborne, Brian)
Related: [-] 112
114 114 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 08/19 7:54 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 20, 2015 at 12:30 P.M. (ET) [Docket No. 110] . Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. Related [+] (Osborne, Brian)
Related: [-] 110
113 113 order Order Wed 08/19 2:18 PM
(COPY FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK) Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue of Affiliate Cases From Delaware to New York. Signed on 8/18/2015. (LB)
Related: [-]
112 112 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Wed 08/19 10:06 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Related [+] Filed by Corporate Resource Services, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2015 at 12:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 110