Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11800

New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert H Jacobvitz
Case #: 1:15-ap-01063
Nature of Suit1 null
2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2015
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quick Cash, Inc.
1310 Metro Avenue
Gallup, NM 87031
Represented By
Daniel J Behles
Moore, Berkson, Bassan & Behles P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Caroline Tullie, on her own behalf, as next friend of Nelson Tullie, and on behalf of others similarly situated
Represented By
Richard N Feferman
contact info

GPO Nov 10 2015
Memorandum Opinion. (pgh)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 01/23 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by NG. Receipt Number 10000075. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/20 10:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, July 18, 2022
40 40 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) Mon 07/18 4:45 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution. (cmw)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/18 4:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1063 Closed. Complaint Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
39 39 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) Wed 07/13 4:14 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 06/24 10:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Notice
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
37 37 notice Notice (with pdf form) Wed 06/22 4:58 PM
Notice of Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution. (pgh)
Related: [-]
36 36 court Minutes of Hearing Wed 06/22 4:19 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on 6/22/22 . (pgh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 06/10 10:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
34 34 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Wed 06/08 11:45 AM
Notice of Status Conference re1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie. Status conference to be held on 6/22/2022 at 1:30 PM in Judge Jacobvitz's Gila Courtroom. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 01/31 10:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
32 32 order Withdraw As Attorney (Order) Tue 01/29 2:36 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw of Attorney filed by Daniel J. Behles. Related [+] (cmw)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, January 18, 2019
31 31 misc Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Fri 01/18 4:03 PM
Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Daniel Behles removed from this case. Attorney Yvette J. Gonzales added to case for Quick Cash, d/b/a Cash Cow Loan Co.,. Filed by Attorney Yvette J. Gonzales. (Gonzales, Yvette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 01/10 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Generic (Order)
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
29 29 order Generic (Order) Tue 01/08 4:47 PM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding. (pgh)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Minutes of Hearing Tue 01/08 2:41 PM
Minutes of Status Conference held on 1/8/19 . (pgh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 12/13 10:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
26 26 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Tue 12/11 4:39 PM
Notice of Hearing. Related [+]. Status conference to be held on 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (pgh)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal,23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thursday, February 22, 2018
25 25 court Minutes of Hearing Thu 02/22 3:44 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on 2/14/2018. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
24 24 notice Deadline to File Objections (Notice) Thu 02/01 11:45 AM
Notice of Deadline to File Objections: Notice served February 1, 2018. Number of days in objection period: 14 + 3 days for mailing. Notice given to parties listed. Related [+]. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Motion by Attorney Daniel J Behles to withdraw as attorney of record. Filed by Defendant Quick Cash, Inc. filed by Defendant Quick Cash, Inc.
23 23 motion Withdraw As Attorney (Motion) Thu 02/01 10:32 AM
Motion by Attorney Daniel J Behles to withdraw as attorney of record. Filed by Defendant Quick Cash, Inc. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
22 22 court Minutes of Hearing Tue 01/09 10:16 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on 1/9/18 . Status conference continued to 2/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (pgh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
21 21 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Thu 01/04 10:17 AM
Notice of Status Conference. Status conference to be held on 1/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
20 20 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Tue 11/28 5:28 PM
Notice of Status Conference. Related [+]. Status conference to be held on 12/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (pgh)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Friday, January 08, 2016
19 19 order Class Action Certification (Order) Fri 01/08 10:05 AM
Order Certifying Class. (pgh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2015
18 18 order Generic (Order) Tue 11/10 4:45 PM
Order Directing Class Representative to Submit Class Certification Order Related [+]. (pgh)
Related: [-] 17 Memorandum Opinion
17 17 15 pgs court Memorandum Opinion Tue 11/10 4:43 PM
Memorandum Opinion. (pgh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 25, 2015
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 10/25 10:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/25/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Modify
Friday, October 23, 2015
15 15 order Modify (Order) Fri 10/23 11:33 AM
Order Denying Emergency Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Related [+] (jgm)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, October 19, 2015
14 14 court Minutes of Hearing Mon 10/19 11:42 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on 10/19/2015 Related [+]. (jgm)
Related: [-] related documents6 Motion to Modify,12 Notice of Hearing
Friday, October 16, 2015
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/16 11:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/16/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
12 12 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Wed 10/14 10:58 AM
Notice of Status Conference re6 Emergency Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie. Status conference to be held on 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 10/04 10:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/04/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order
Friday, October 02, 2015
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/02 2:55 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Status conference to be held on 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (jgm)
Related: [-] related document6 Motion to Modify filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie
9 9 answer Objection Fri 10/02 12:08 PM
Objection to Related [+]. Filed by Creditor Superior Fabrication (Fish, Paul)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Modify
Thursday, September 24, 2015
8 8 court Minutes of Hearing Thu 09/24 2:47 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on 09/23/2015 Related [+]. Final hearing to be held on 10/19/2015 at 01:00 PM at Judge Jacobvitz's Courtroom.(jgm)
Related: [-] related document6 Motion to Modify
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
7 7 notice Hearing (Notice) Tue 09/22 3:42 PM
Notice of hearing Related [+]. Preliminary hearing to be held on 9/23/2015 at 04:00 PM in Judge Jacobvitz's Courtroom. (Feferman, Richard) Modified on 9/23/2015 to include hearing location. (mrm)
Related: [-] 6 Emergency Motion to Modify: Filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie
6 6 motion Modify (Motion) Tue 09/22 1:53 PM
Emergency Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie (Feferman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, August 13, 2015
5 5 misc Generic Document Thu 08/13 9:34 AM
notice Filed by Plaintiff Caroline Tullie. (Feferman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
utility Terminate Deadline Tue 08/11 4:06 PM
Terminated Deadline: Notice of Failure to File Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate Ownership can be found in Exhibit 1, page 34, attached to complaint. (cmw) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
4 4 court Minutes of Hearing Mon 08/10 5:27 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on 8/10/15 . (pgh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2015
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/08 10:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/08/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, August 06, 2015
2 2 notice Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients Thu 08/06 3:01 PM
Notice of Status Conference. Status conference to be held on 8/10/2015 at 03:00 PM in Judge Jacobvitz's Hearing Room. (jmr)
Related: [-]
court Set Judge Code Flag Thu 08/06 1:37 PM
Set Judge Code Flag to JA (Jacobvitz-Albuquerque) . (cmw)
Related: [-]
court Entry (Public - NEF will go to all parties) Thu 08/06 1:53 PM
Filing Fee Amount $350.00 deferred at case opening; clerk's notice of fees due has been entered in bankruptcy case 15-11800 (cmw)
Related: [-]
notice Failure to File Corporate Ownership Statement (Notice) Thu 08/06 1:54 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE by Clerk of Court: Notice of failure to file corporate ownership statement: the corporate ownership statement required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) to be filed with the petition has not been filed in this case, or the corporate ownership statement required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 to be filed with the corporate party's first pleading in an adversary proceeding has not been filed in this adversary proceeding. If the statement is not filed within ten (10) days of the date of this notice, further action will be taken by the Court. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED . Deadline for submission of Corporate Ownership Statement: 8/17/2015. Re-Audit date: 8/18/2015. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 08/05 3:20 PM
Adversary case 15-01063 (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))): Notice of Removal by Defendant Quick Cash, Inc.. Receipt Number: Deferred, Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case
Att: 2 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case
Att: 3 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case
Att: 4 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case
Att: 5 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case
Att: 6 Exhibit Pleadings in removed case