Defense Distributed, et al v. U. S. Dept. of State, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-00372
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cr-50759 |
Type | civil rights / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2016 6:19 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE K. MIKE CONAWAY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE DANIEL WEBSTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE TODD ROKITA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE BILL POSEY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE JEFF MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE RAUL LABRADOR
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE STEVE KING
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MIKE KELLY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE WALTER JONES
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE PAUL GOSAR
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE JOHN FLEMING
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE JEFF DUNCAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE BRIAN BABIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS MASSIE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CATO INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THOMAS JEFFERSON CENTER FOR THE PROTECTION OF FREE EXPRESSION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GLENN SMITH, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Senior Advisor, Office of Defense Trade Controls
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SARAH J. HEIDEMA, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as the Division Chief, Regulatory and Multilateral Affairs, Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
C. EDWARD PEARTREE, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Director of the Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy Division
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH B. HANDELMAN, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Deputy Assistant Secretary of State for Defense Trade Controls in the Bureau of Political-Military Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DIRECTORATE OF DEFENSE TRADE CONTROLS, Department of State Bureau of Political Military Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN F. KERRY, In His Official Capacity as the Secretary of the Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 20 2016
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-50759 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JEG. Mandate pull date is 11/14/2016 [15-50759] |
Docket last updated: 09/21/2016 6:19 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated 15-50759 (NFD) |