CCR International, Inc. v. Elias Group, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | Kevin Nathaniel Fox |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-06563 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 17:43(a) Lanham Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jan 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2016 7:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Coco Rico, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elias Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CCR International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
277 | 277
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 12/21 4:46 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to276 Notice of Appeal, filed by CCR Development Group, Inc., CCR International, Inc. USCA Case Number 21-2231 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/21/2021. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 12/21 4:47 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:277 USCA Mandate. (tp) |