Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-02642
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2014
Terminated:Oct 31, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 7:39 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason J. Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 7:16 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 22, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1280159] 14-2642 [Entered: 07/26/2014 05:10 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/20/2014, RECEIVED.[1280160] 14-2642 [Entered: 07/26/2014 05:15 PM]
Related: [-]