Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-03338
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2014
Terminated:Oct 22, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 12:54 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Blackman
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason J. Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 12:32 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1315511] 14-3338 [Entered: 09/09/2014 12:17 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0208-10051743, FILED.[1315515] 14-3338 [Entered: 09/09/2014 12:19 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/06/2014, RECEIVED.[1315517] 14-3338 [Entered: 09/09/2014 12:20 PM]
Related: [-]