Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-01641

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 2:15-ap-80170
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2015
Terminated:May 09, 2018

Debtor
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
PO Box 1437
Myrtle Beach, SC 29578
Represented By
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Hill
140 Cold Stream Cove Loop Unit 806
Murrells Inlet, SC 29576
Represented By
Michael Hill
contact info
Defendant
Donald Kamenz
23348 Water Circle
Boca Raton, FL 33486
Represented By
Donald Kamenz
contact info
Defendant
Derek Nice
Represented By
Derek Nice
contact info
Defendant
Carol Drew
Represented By
Carol Drew
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle L. Vieira as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
Represented By
Barbara George Barton
contact info
Trustee
Michelle L. Vieira
P O Box 70309
Myrtle Beach, SC 29572

GPO Apr 12 2016
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Michael Hill, Defendant Donald Kamenz, Defendant Derek Nice, Defendant Carol Drew, Defendant Jesper Lundberg Document Served. (related document(s)31). (Phipps, S)
GPO Jun 02 2017
Order on Motion For Summary Judgment (Related Doc 65). Document Served. (Weathers, K)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, May 11, 2018
132 132 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sat 05/12 12:34 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/11/2018. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 129
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
131 131 court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/09 10:06 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
130 130 utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/09 10:04 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-80170 settling Complaint. (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
129 129 order Amend Application Wed 05/09 10:03 AM
Consent Order Approving Settlement and Compromise Related [+] (Weathers, K)
Related: [-] 127