South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 2:15-bk-01641
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Apr 23, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 14, 2015
Terminated:Nov 13, 2019

Debtor
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Tehcnical Services
140 Cold Stream Cove Loop Unit 806
Murrells Inlet, SC 29576-9218
Represented By
Julio E. Mendoza, Jr.
Nexsen Pruet, LLC
contact info
Debtor
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
140 Cold Stream Cove Loop Unit 806
Murrells Inlet, SC 29576-9218
Represented By
Julio E. Mendoza, Jr.
Nexsen Pruet, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle L. Vieira
PO Box 70309
Myrtle Beach, SC 29572
Represented By
Adam J. Floyd
Barton Law Firm, PA
contact info
Barbara George Barton
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
John Timothy Stack
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. South Carolina aviation business files for bankruptcy (postandcourier.com)
Submitted Thu 03/26/2015
Docket last updated: 03/24/2015 7:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty) 15-01641 [misc,volp7ac] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 8831053, amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filed by Julio E. Mendoza Jr. of Nexsen Pruet, LLC on behalf of KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Tehcnical Services. (Mendoza, Julio)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, Deadlines and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Michelle L. Vieira, . Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/23/2015 at 03:30 PM at Charleston.
Related: [-]