Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-01641

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 2:15-ap-80171
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2015
Terminated:Oct 01, 2015

Debtor
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
PO Box 1437
Myrtle Beach, SC 29578
Represented By
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jesper Lundberg
Represented By
Jesper Lundberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle L. Vieira as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
Represented By
Barbara George Barton
contact info
Trustee
Michelle L. Vieira
P O Box 70309
Myrtle Beach, SC 29572


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Thursday, October 01, 2015
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/01 3:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/01 3:01 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-80171 consolidated with A/P 15-80170 A/P 15-80170 is the LEAD CASE Complaint. (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Consolidate Thu 10/01 2:58 PM
Order Granting Motion To Consolidate Adversary Proceedings 15-80171 and 15-80170 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING 15-80170 WILL BE THE LEAD ADVERSARY. THERE SHOULD BE FURTHER DOCKETING TO THIS ADVERSARY. ALL DOCUMENTS SHOULD BE DOCKETED TO THE LEAD ADVERSARY 15-80170 Related [+]. Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to SC LBR 5075-1 (Weathers, K)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
10 10 motion Consolidate Thu 10/01 2:54 PM
Motion to Consolidate Case 15-80171 with Associated Case(s) 15-80170 with Certificate of Service Filed by Jesper Lundberg. (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 9:52 AM
Certificate of Service related to Complaint, Summons Reissued (pdf) Filed by Michelle L. Vieira as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services Related [+]. (Floyd, Adam)
Related: [-] 5 ,1
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
utility Reset Answer Deadline Wed 09/23 11:56 AM
Jesper Lundberg Answer Deadline Reset for 11/2/2015. (Per Order Extending Time entered today (related document8 ) (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
8 8 order Extend Time Wed 09/23 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead until November 2, 2015. Related [+]. Document Served. (Phipps, S)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, September 21, 2015
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 09/21 5:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Amy H. Wooten of Brown Law LLP on behalf of Jesper Lundberg. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extend Time Mon 09/21 12:40 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer or Otherwise Plead with Certificate of Service Filed by Jesper Lundberg Related [+]. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time To Answer
Friday, September 11, 2015
5 5 cmp Summons Reissued (pdf) Fri 09/11 2:28 PM
Reissued Summons on Jesper Lundberg Answer Due 10/13/2015 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Fri 09/11 2:23 PM
Request for Reissued Summons Filed by Michelle L. Vieira as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services (Barton, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2015
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/03 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service related to Complaint, Summons Issued Filed by Michelle L. Vieira as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services Related [+]. (Barton, Barbara)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 09/02 1:56 PM
Summons Issued on Jesper Lundberg Answer Due 10/2/2015 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
court Add Judge Wed 09/02 8:21 AM
Judge David R. Duncan added to case (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/01 4:25 PM
Adversary case 15-80171 Complaint by Michelle Vieira against Jesper Lundberg Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Barton, Barbara)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Tue 09/01 4:25 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 15-80171 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9112824, amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]