Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:15-ap-01363
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2015
Terminated:Jun 01, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Anna's Linens, Inc.
3550 Hyland Avenue
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Represented By
Anna's Linens, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Salus Capital Partners, LLC
1840 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Salus Capital Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd.
Represented By
Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
DCP Linens Lender, LLC
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166
Represented By
DCP Linens Lender, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Exel Inc.
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LL 4 Embarcadero Center,17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Steven B Sacks
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Frank Cadigan
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
31 31 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/01 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1363 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 30, 2016
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 04/30 9:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 28, 2016
30 30 court Hearing Held (Motion) Mon 05/02 4:16 PM
Hearing Held RE: Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, LTD and DCP Linens Lender, LLC's Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Withdrawn as moot (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
29 29 court Hearing Held (Motion) Mon 05/02 4:13 PM
Hearing Held RE Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement - Withdrawn as moot (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 05/02 4:05 PM
Hearing Held RE Status Conference RE: Complaint - Off Calendar in favor of stipulation and order uploaded (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Thu 04/28 5:08 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 4/28/2016 Related [+]. (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc.,4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC,8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
25 25 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 04/27 6:24 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc., DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Exel Inc., Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC and for dismissal Filed by Defendants Anna's Linens, Inc., DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Plaintiff Exel Inc. (Sacks, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
24 24 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 04/22 5:13 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Sanders, Nanette. (Sanders, Nanette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/25 4:41 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/28/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 2-19-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc.
Sunday, February 21, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/21 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, February 19, 2016
21 21 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 02/19 11:57 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Joint Status Conference - the Status Conference set for February 25, 2016, at 10:00 am is Continued to April 28, 2016 at 10:00 am (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/19/2016 (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, February 18, 2016
20 20 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 02/18 9:15 AM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and Exel, Inc. and Salus Capital Partners, LLC -[Stipulation To Continue Hearing On Joint Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/29 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 28, 2016
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 01/29 4:44 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON DEBTOR'S MOTION AND SALUS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ENTERED 1-27-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 01/29 4:42 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON DEBTOR'S MOTION AND SALUS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ENTERED 1-27-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/27 1:04 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Hearings On Debtor's Motion and Salus' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+] - HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE HEARINGS ON (i) DEBTOR'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT [ADV. PROC. DOCKET ENTERY NO.4] AND (ii) SALUS CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC, SALUS CLO 2012-1, LTD. AND DCP LINENS LENDER, LLC'S NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY COMPLAINT [ADV. PROC. DOCKET ENTRY NO. 8] ARE CONTINUED FROM JANUARY 28, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. TO APRIL 28, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 1/27/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 01/27 11:17 AM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and Exel, Inc. -[Stipulation To Continue Hearing On Debtors Motion And Salus Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (POS Attached)]- Filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
14 14 answer Reply Thu 01/21 6:19 PM
Reply to Related [+] Joinder to Debtor's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC (Steinberg, Howard)
Related: [-] 13 Reply filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc.
13 13 answer Reply Thu 01/21 5:49 PM
Reply to Related [+] -[Debtors Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement (POS Attached)]- Filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 12 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc.
Thursday, January 14, 2016
12 12 answer Opposition Thu 01/14 7:19 PM
Opposition to Related [+] (Proof of Service Attached) Filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc. (Sacks, Steven)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding -[Debtors Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement (POS Attached)]- filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC,8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice
Thursday, December 03, 2015
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 12/03 5:53 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/25/2016 at 10:00 AM Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg 411 W Fourth St Crtrm 5B Santa Ana, CA 92701 for1 , (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Exel Inc.
Thursday, November 19, 2015
11 11 misc Status report Thu 11/19 3:53 PM
Status report Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by Defendants Anna's Linens, Inc., DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Plaintiff Exel Inc. Related [+]. (Sacks, Steven)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
10 10 court Hearing Set (Motion) Fri 10/16 4:31 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 10/14 4:17 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Fidelity & Guaranty Life, HRG Group, Inc., Salus Capital Partners, LLC. Filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC. (Steinberg, Howard)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Wed 10/14 4:13 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC (Steinberg, Howard)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 10/14 1:03 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Defendant Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Defendant DCP Linens Lender, LLC
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 10/14 11:44 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Karasik, Eve. (Karasik, Eve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
5 5 misc Request for judicial notice Tue 10/13 4:27 PM
Request for judicial notice -[Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Debtors Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement (POS Attached)]- Filed by Defendants Anna's Linens, Inc., DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding -[Debtors Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement (POS Attached)]-
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Tue 10/13 4:25 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding -[Debtors Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement (POS Attached)]- Filed by Defendants Anna's Linens, Inc., DCP Linens Lender, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., Salus Capital Partners, LLC (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
3 3 misc Proof of service Fri 10/02 4:57 PM
Proof of service of Summons and Notice of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding [LBR 7004-1] Filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc. Related [+]. (Sacks, Steven)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 10, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/10 11:55 AM
Summons Issued on Anna's Linens, Inc. Date Issued 9/10/2015, Answer Due 10/13/2015; DCP Linens Lender, LLC Date Issued 9/10/2015, Answer Due 10/13/2015; Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd. Date Issued 9/10/2015, Answer Due 10/13/2015; Salus Capital Partners, LLC Date Issued 9/10/2015, Answer Due 10/13/2015 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/3/2015 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Exel Inc.
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/09 2:18 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01363. Complaint by Exel Inc. against Anna's Linens, Inc., Salus Capital Partners, LLC, Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd., DCP Linens Lender, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Sacks, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AP cover sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 09/09 2:21 PM
Receipt of Complaint(8:15-ap-01363-TA) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40777109. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1