Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-04671

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:15-ap-00873
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2015
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blocker Ranch
1303 W. New Market Rd.
Immokalee, FL 34142
Represented By
Blocker Ranch
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Brian Blocker
1830 16th St. N.E.
Naples, FL 34120
Represented By
Jerry Brian Blocker
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth James Blocker
1303 W. New Market Rd.
Immokalee, FL 34142
Represented By
Kenneth James Blocker
contact info
Plaintiff
Grainger Farms, Inc.
P.O. Box 20938
Bradenton, FL 34204
Represented By
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/31 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-873 Closed. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2017
13 13 order Order Dismissing Adversary Thu 03/30 9:20 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary . Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Thu 03/30 11:12 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, July 08, 2016
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 07/08 10:07 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:15-bk-4671-MGW . (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
court Compromise Cross-Reference Wed 06/08 3:05 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:15-bk-4671 . (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
12 12 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/18 2:58 PM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 on Jerry Brian Blocker, Kenneth James Blocker, and Blocker Ranch Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
11 11 order Continue/Reschedule Hearing Wed 03/16 3:31 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing Re: Trial Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2016 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 10
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Wed 03/16 4:28 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
10 10 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing Tue 02/09 12:20 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing On /Trial and Other Deadlines Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, January 04, 2016
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 01/04 3:44 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, December 31, 2015
9 9 order Order Scheduling Thu 12/31 9:31 AM
Agreed Order Scheduling Trial (Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed by March 15, 2016) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, November 12, 2015
8 8 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 11/13 2:06 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter: Pltf Atty, Steven Bracci (telephonic): Def Atty RULING: Pretrial Conference - Agreed P/T Order, Setting Trial for 4/25 @ 9:30 a.m., order by Stichter Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Thu 11/05 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/04/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Monday, November 02, 2015
6 6 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Mon 11/02 5:56 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/12/2015 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Pamella)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 10/16 9:32 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Steven J Bracci on behalf of Defendant Blocker Ranch Related [+]. (Bracci, Steven)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, October 15, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/15 2:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Steven J Bracci on behalf of Defendants Jerry Brian Blocker, Kenneth James Blocker, Blocker Ranch. (Bracci, Steven)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 09/30 4:12 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership (Rule 7007.1) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc.. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 09/24 10:00 AM
Summons issued along with Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 - Prescribing Procedures for Adversary Proceedings. Answer Due 10/26/2015. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Wed 09/23 4:53 PM
Complaint by Grainger Farms, Inc. against Blocker Ranch, Jerry Brian Blocker, Kenneth James Blocker. Filing Fee Not Required. for Breach of terms of purchase of personal property at auction approved by this Court Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other