Esco Marine, Inc. v. Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 2:15-ap-02015 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2015 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esco Marine, Inc.
Langley & Banack, Inc c/o Allen M. DeBard 745 E. Mulberry, Suite 900
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:23 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
court
Courtroom Minutes
Wed 04/20 9:15 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:10 AM. Appearances: Natalie Wilson. The 9019 has been signed. Once payments are made, counsel will file a motion to dismiss. (aalo) |
|
Sunday, April 10, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/11 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extend Time
Fri 04/08 4:43 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment Signed on 4/8/2016. (dsta) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend Time
Fri 03/11 10:07 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Filing Summary Judgment Motions Filed by Esco Marine, Inc. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Statement
Fri 01/22 2:12 PM
Statement Plaintiff Esco Marine, Inc.'s Designation of Expert Witnesses (Filed By Esco Marine, Inc. ). (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 01/15 2:25 PM
Answer to Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. Counterclaim Filed by Esco Marine, Inc. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Initial Disclosure Rule 26
Fri 01/08 2:59 PM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. ). (Terry, Eric) |
|
Sunday, December 06, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/07 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/06/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Fri 12/04 8:37 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 12/2/2015 Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 09:00 AM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. Pre-Trial Order due by 4/18/2016. Discovery due by 2/29/2016. (dsta) |
|
13 | 13
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Wed 12/02 10:43 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:11 am Appearances: Allen DeBard for the Plaintiffs (via phone), Eric Terry for Defendant (via phone), Pete Holzer for Callidus. Any motions to withdraw reference should be filed by 12/16/15, Initial Disclosures due 1/4/16, Discovery deadline 2/29/16, any motions for summary judgment should be filed by 3/14/16, party with burden of proof to designate experts/file reports by 1/22/16, responding party to designate experts/file reports by 2/5/16, pretrial statement due 4/18/16. Pretrial Conference scheduled for 4/20/2016 at 09:00 AM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. (ewin) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim
Tue 12/01 5:45 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. against Esco Marine, Inc. Filed by Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc.(Terry, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 verification | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosure Rule 26
Wed 11/25 9:17 AM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Esco Marine, Inc., Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. ). (Ayers, Roderick) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/19 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/18/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Mon 11/16 12:59 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2015 at 10:00 AM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. (aalo) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/20 10:15 AM
Stipulation By Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. and Esco Marine. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. ). (Terry, Eric) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 10/02 10:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on Esco Marine, Inc. 10/2/2015. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Fri 10/02 9:24 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Esco Marine, Inc. ) (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/30 10:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc. Date Issued 9/30/2015. (jdav) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 09/29 11:29 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc.. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Sunday, September 27, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 09/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 09/25 6:30 AM
Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 09/24 5:03 PM
Adversary case 15-02015 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Esco Marine, Inc. against Henry & Sons Construction Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (DeBard, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/24 5:04 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-02015 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17283769. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |