Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-01641

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 2:15-ap-80178
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2015
Terminated:Oct 22, 2015

Debtor
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
PO Box 1437
Myrtle Beach, SC 29578
Represented By
KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Hill
140 Cold Stream Cove Loop Unit 806
Murrells Inlet, SC 29576
Represented By
Michael Hill
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Vieira, as Chapter 7 Trustee for KNH Aviation Services, Inc. d/b/a AvCraft Technical Services
PO Box 12046
Columbia, SC 29211
Represented By
Barbara George Barton
contact info
Trustee
Michelle L. Vieira
PO Box 70309
Myrtle Beach, SC 29572


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Thursday, October 22, 2015
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/22 2:28 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/22 2:27 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Complaint Number 15-80178 Consolidated with 15-80170 (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Consolidate Thu 10/22 2:01 PM
Order Granting Motion To Consolidate Adversary Proceedings 15-80178 and 15-80170 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING 15-80170 WILL BE THE LEAD ADVERSARY. THERE SHOULD BE NO FURTHER DOCKETING TO THIS ADVERSARY. ALL DOCUMENTS SHOULD BE DOCKETED TO THE LEAD ADVERSARY 15-8017 Related [+]. Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to SC LBR 5075-1 (Phipps, S)
Related: [-] 7
6 6 order Extend Time Thu 10/22 1:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Related [+]. Document Served. (Phipps, S)
Related: [-] 5
utility Reset Answer Deadline Thu 10/22 1:33 PM
Michael Hill Answer Deadline Reset for 12/2/2015. (Per Order Extending Time to Answer entered today.) (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
7 7 motion Consolidate Thu 10/22 1:56 PM
Motion to Consolidate Case 15-80178 with Associated Case(s) 15-80170 with Certificate of Service Filed by Amy H. Wooten of Brown Law LLP on behalf of Michael Hill. (Phipps, S)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extend Time Tue 10/20 4:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer or Otherwise Plead with Certificate of Service Filed by Michael Hill. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 09, 2015
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/09 10:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Amy H. Wooten of Brown Law LLP on behalf of Michael Hill. (Wooten, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/02 1:07 PM
Certificate of Service related to Complaint, Summons Issued Filed by Michelle Vieira Related [+]. (Barton, Barbara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Thursday, October 01, 2015
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 10/01 9:34 AM
Summons Issued on Michael Hill Answer Due 11/2/2015 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
court Add Judge Thu 10/01 8:08 AM
Judge David R. Duncan added to case (Weathers, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 4:20 PM
Adversary case 15-80178 Complaint by Michelle Vieira against Michael Hill Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference), 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Barton, Barbara)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Wed 09/30 4:33 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 15-80178 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9162469, amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]