Roberts v. Colvin
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01232 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 03/09 12:38 PM
USCA Mandate (certified copy) as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Keith A Roberts: USCA Case 17-1533 The judgment of the district court is affirmed with costs.(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Order, | ||
Att: 2 Final Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Denial of Petition for Rehearing | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
Supplemental Record Sent to USCA
Fri 08/18 9:33 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal sent to USCA for USCA Case Number 17-1533 consisting of 1 Administrative Transcript (Dkt #13) re29 Notice of Appeal. Document sent to USCA in hard copy; electronic copy not available.(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Pleadings Index | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 08/18 9:15 AM
ORDER of USCA re29 Notice of Appeal filed by Keith A Roberts. The district court is directed to transmit a supplemental record containing the certified copy of the administrative transcript (ECF #13). (tlf) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 08/18 9:45 AM
Copy of Supplemental Record Transmittal39 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A Roberts. (tlf) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Wed 08/02 3:14 PM
Certified Record on Appeal Transmitted to US Court of Appeals consisting of 2 Vol Pleadings re29 Notice of Appeal; USCA Case 17-1533 (cc: all counsel via CM/ECF, Keith Roberts via US Mail, Jonathan Koenig via e-mail)(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Pleadings Index | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Appeal Record Request
Wed 08/02 3:07 PM
Appeal Record Request received from 7th Cir. Re: USCA Case Number 17-1533 (tlf) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Prepared
Fri 03/31 3:07 PM
Appeal Record Prepared re29 Notice of Appeal (lh) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 03/13 2:54 PM
USCA Case Number 17-1533 re:29 Notice of Appeal filed by Keith A Roberts. (tlf) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Mon 03/13 2:29 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/13/2017. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Keith Roberts) (Griesbach, William) |
|
33 | 33
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 03/13 1:24 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re29 Notice of Appeal (mac) |
|
32 | 32
appeal
Pro Se Cover Letter
Mon 03/13 1:18 PM
Pro Se Cover Letter re:29 Notice of Appeal (mac) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Mon 03/13 11:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Keith A Roberts. (mac) |
|
30 | 30
appeal
Docketing Statement
Mon 03/13 11:34 AM
Docketing Statement (Unsigned) by Keith A Roberts re29 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (mac) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 03/13 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Decision and Order,27 Judgment by Keith A Roberts. (cc: all counsel) (mac) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 03/13 1:30 PM
Copy of Short Record33 and Pro Se Cover Letter32 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A Roberts together with Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet (mac) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Tue 02/14 11:01 AM
REVISED26 Decision and Order signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2/14/2017. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Keith Roberts)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Mon 02/13 2:54 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2/13/17. (cc: all counsel)(cav) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Supplement
Mon 02/13 2:51 PM
DECISION AND ORDER denying21 Motion to Supplement; denying23 Motion for Order to Produce Record. The decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 02/13 2:56 PM
Copy of Judgment27 , Order on Motion to Supplement,26 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Roberts (cav) |
||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 01/27 10:23 AM
NOTICE to Counsel: Nancy A Berryhill became the Acting Commissioner of Social Security on January 23, 2017. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Nancy A Berryhill is substituted for Carolyn W Colvin as the defendant in this suit. No further action need be taken to continue this suit by reason of the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (tlf) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Fri 01/20 11:17 AM
RESPONSE filed by Carolyn W Colvin re24 Order (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Thu 12/22 9:01 AM
ORDER REGARDING JUDICIAL NOTICE (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Keith Roberts)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Order
Fri 06/10 1:50 PM
MOTION for Order by Keith A Roberts.(tp) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply (Non-Motion)
Fri 06/10 1:44 PM
REPLY filed by Keith A Roberts re20 Commissioners Brief - Social Security. (tp) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Supplement
Mon 06/06 2:08 PM
MOTION to Supplement by Keith A Roberts.(tp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits #1-10, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
socsec
Commissioners Brief - Social Security
Thu 05/26 5:21 PM
Commissioners Brief filed by Carolyn W Colvin. (Schepard, Eric) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/26 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H Schepard on behalf of Carolyn W Colvin. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Schepard(Schepard, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
order
Text Only Order
Thu 04/28 11:43 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carolyn W Colvin, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/28/2016. Defendant may file her Brief by May 26, 2016; Plaintiff's Reply Brief is due June 10, 2016. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/25 8:30 AM
DECLARATION of Ameenah Lewis (Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/25 8:29 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Carolyn W Colvin.(Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
order
Text Only Order
Wed 03/30 10:06 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING15 First MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carolyn W Colvin, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/30/2016. Defendant's time to file her Brief is extended through April 26, 2016, and Plaintiff's Reply Brief is due May 11, 2016. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
||
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/29 3:14 PM
DECLARATION of Ameenah Lewis (Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 03/29 3:12 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time by Carolyn W Colvin.(Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
socsec
Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security
Thu 02/18 1:31 PM
Plaintiffs Brief by Keith A Roberts. (tp) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
socsec
Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript
Wed 01/13 11:46 AM
Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Carolyn W Colvin. (See case file for hard copy.) (aw) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
socsec
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript
Fri 01/08 2:45 PM
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Carolyn W Colvin. (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11
socsec
Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript
Fri 01/08 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Carolyn W Colvin (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/18 7:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis on behalf of Carolyn W Colvin. Attorney(s) appearing: Ameenah Lewis (Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 11/12 2:50 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carolyn W Colvin. (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
socsec
Briefing Letter
Tue 11/10 9:04 AM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 2/18/2016; Defendants response due 3/29/16; Plaintiffs reply due 4/13/16. (cc: all counsel) (cav) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 11/10 9:20 AM
Copy of Briefing Letter8 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Roberts (cav) |
||
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
socsec
Return of Service
Mon 11/09 1:55 PM
Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/2/2015. (cav) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
socsec
Transmittal of Complaint and Order
Thu 10/29 9:53 AM
Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (mec) |
||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 10/27 4:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on October 27, 2015. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 10/27 4:18 PM
Copy of Order,6 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Roberts. (mec) |
||
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/21 10:30 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Keith A Roberts. (aw) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 10/19 5:47 PM
ORDER DENYING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith A Roberts, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/19/2015. Unless plaintiff submits a signed complaint within the next 14 days, the case will be dismissed. Plaintiff may either pay his filing fee in full or submit a signed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (cc: all counsel via efile, Roberts via U.S. Mail)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Thu 10/15 3:11 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to Keith A Roberts requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 21 days. The plaintiff is also instructed to sign and return the signature pages for both the complaint and motion. (cav) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/15 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (UNSIGNED) by Keith A Roberts. (cav) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Thu 10/15 2:49 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT (UNSIGNED) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Keith A Roberts ; Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge David E. Jones (cav) |