NEGRON v. Bank Of America Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Referred: | Ronald L Ellis |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-08296 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 18, 2016 5:33 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Bank of America, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Bank Of America Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bank Of America Securities LLC
|
|
Defendant
Steve Curtis
|
|
Defendant
James Holloway
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Holz
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Lovvorn
|
|
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA (F/K/A MERRILL LYNCH IQ)
|
|
Defendant
Nick Pinarligil
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Banc of America Securities, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America Securities, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Larry Negron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LARRY NEGRON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
130 | 130
misc
Costs Taxed
Thu 06/06 2:50 PM
Costs Taxed as to129 USCA Mandate. USCA Case Number 17-2192 in the amount of $179.60, on 6/6/2019 in favor of Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Merrill Lynch, Banc of America Securities, LLC, Nick Pinarligil, James Holloway, Thomas Holz, Bank of America, N.A. against Appellant Larry Negron. (tp) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Mon 06/03 9:32 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:129 USCA Mandate,. (nd) |
||
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
129 | 129
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 06/03 9:31 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to116 Notice of Appeal filed by Larry Negron. USCA Case Number 17-2192 cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/31/2019. (nd) |