Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-04671

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:15-ap-00928
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2015
Terminated:Mar 24, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James R. Grainger, Defendant
10009 Clubhouse Drive
Bradenton, FL 34202
Represented By
Michael C Markham
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Defendant
Debra Grainger, Defendant
10009 Clubhouse Drive
Bradenton, FL 34202
Represented By
Michael C Markham
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Crop Production Services, Inc., Plaintiff
3005 Rocky Mountain Ave.
Loveland, CO 80538
Represented By
Crop Production Services, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, March 24, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/24 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-928 Closed. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
30 30 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 09/28 3:16 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter for Dbtr RULING: *(1) 7th Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal, ~(2) Cont. Hrg. on Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12, ~(3) Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John) Doc #20 - (1-3) Cont. to 12/7 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4 15
29 29 misc Stipulation Wed 09/28 9:27 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
28 28 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 08/18 12:39 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Harris for Dbtr RULING: *(1) 6th Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal, ~(2) Cont. Hrg. on Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12, ~(3) Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John) Doc #20 - (1-3) - Cont. to 9/28 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4 15
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
27 27 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 06/22 5:38 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: John Mueller: Pltf Atty, Scott Stichter & Amy Harris for Dbtr RULING: *(1) 5th Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal, ~(2) Cont. Hrg. on Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12, ~(3) Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John) Doc #20 - (1-3) - Cont. to 8/17 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4 15
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
26 26 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 05/26 12:48 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: John Mueller: Pltf Atty, Amy Harris for Dbtr RULING: *(1) 4TH Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal, ~(2) Cont. Hrg. on Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12, ~(3) Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John) Doc #20 - (1-3) Cont. to 6/22 @ 11:00 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4 15
Monday, April 04, 2016
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 04/04 3:10 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Defendants Debra Grainger, James R. Grainger Related [+]. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
25 25 order Order (Generic) Wed 03/30 2:49 PM
Order canceling Trial and abating proceeding; a Status Conference will be scheduled Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dana)
Related: [-] 23 ,24
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
24 24 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 03/24 6:52 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: AMY HARRIS, DENISE BARNETT, GARY BARNES, MICHAEL MARKHAM, KEN MCINTYRE, JOHN MUELLER, NOEL BOEKE, MICHAEL LESSNE(CC) RULING: (1) 3rd Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal: CONT. TO 05/25/2016 @ 11AM AOCNFNG *(2) Cont. Hrg. on Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12 *(3) Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John) Doc #20 [Trial set for 3/29 @ 1:30 p.m.] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4 15
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
23 23 notice Notice Of Hearing Wed 03/09 2:10 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/23/2016 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/08 2:08 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Agreed Order to Shorten Time for Service of Answers to Interrogatories Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 21
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Tue 03/08 10:45 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 03/23/2016 10:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Doc20 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: John H Mueller is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, March 07, 2016
21 21 order Shorten Time Mon 03/07 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time Related [+] for Defendants to Respond to Crop Production Services, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Service Instructions: John Mueller is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina) Modified on 3/7/2016 (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 15
Saturday, March 05, 2016
20 20 motion Motion to Compel Sat 03/05 12:38 PM
Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, March 04, 2016
19 19 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Fri 03/04 9:19 AM
Second Amended Notice of Witnesses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 18 ,17
Monday, February 29, 2016
18 18 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Mon 02/29 4:24 PM
Amended Notice of Witnesses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, February 26, 2016
17 17 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Fri 02/26 5:06 PM
Notice of Witnesses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
16 16 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 02/17 5:53 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Robert Clark: Pltf Atty, Michael Markham: Def Atty RULING: (1) 2nd Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal, *(2) Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John) Doc #12 [Trial set for 3/29 @ 1:30 p.m.] - (1&2) Cont. to 3/23 @ 10:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
15 15 motion Motion to Shorten Time Tue 02/16 2:45 PM
Motion to Shorten Time for Defendants to Respond to Crop Production Services, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
14 14 notice Notice Of Hearing Fri 01/22 5:13 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2016 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, January 21, 2016
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Thu 01/21 9:50 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 02/17/2016 10:00 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Doc12 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: John H Mueller is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
13 13 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 01/21 4:32 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: John Mueller: Pltf Atty, Michael Markham: Def Atty RULING: Cont. Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal [Trial set for 3/29 @ 1:30 p.m.] - Cont. to 2/17 @ 10:00 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
12 12 motion Motion to Strike Tue 01/19 4:19 PM
Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Tue 11/24 6:17 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Defendants Debra Grainger, James R. Grainger Related [+]. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
Friday, November 20, 2015
11 11 misc Proof of Service Fri 11/20 9:41 AM
Proof of Service of Order Setting Trial and Establishing Pre-Trial Procedures. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Defendants Debra Grainger, James R. Grainger Related [+]. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 8
court ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day Fri 11/20 12:17 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order8 is not indicated on the docket. Michael Markham is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
10 10 order Compel Thu 11/19 3:56 PM
Order Granting Motion To Compel Mediation. Appointing Mediator and Establishing Compensation. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 order Order Continuing Pretrial Conference Thu 11/19 3:49 PM
Order Continuing Pretrial Conference . Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2015
8 8 order Order Setting Trial and Establishing Pre-Trial Procedures Mon 11/16 11:34 AM
Order Setting Trial and Establishing Pre-Trial Procedures . Trial date set for 3/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2015
7 7 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 11/13 2:06 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: John Mueller: Pltf Atty, Angelina Lim: Def Atty RULING: Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal - Cont. P/T on 1/20/16 @ 11:00 a.m., order by Lim; Set for Trial on 3/29/16 @ 1:30 p.m., order by Ct. (Case Mgr.) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion to Compel Thu 11/12 9:04 AM
Agreed Motion to Compel Mediation Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Defendants Debra Grainger, James R. Grainger. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/04 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by John H Mueller on behalf of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc.. (Mueller, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/02 4:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Defendants Debra Grainger, James R. Grainger. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, October 24, 2015
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sun 10/25 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/24/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Thursday, October 22, 2015
2 2 court Notice Of Hearing Thu 10/22 2:14 PM
Notice of Pretrial Conference on Notice of Removal . Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
1 1 cmp Notice Of Removal Wed 10/21 3:43 PM
Notice of Removal by Defendants James R. Grainger, II and Debra Grainger . (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)]. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 10/21 3:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Notice of Removal(8:15-ap-00928-MGW) [cmp,ntcrmvl2] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 47505799, Amount Paid $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]