District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:15-cv-01806
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2015
Terminated:Jul 25, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2016 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By
Richard Jeremy Hagerman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Geoffrey John Klimas
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER
Represented By
Richard Jeremy Hagerman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Geoffrey John Klimas
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
JOHN KOSKINEN
Represented By
Richard Jeremy Hagerman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Geoffrey John Klimas
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Joseph E. Hunsader
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard Jeremy Hagerman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Geoffrey John Klimas
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
SUZANNE BATRA
Represented By
George M. Clarke, III
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info
Joseph Brant Judkins
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN
Represented By
George M. Clarke, III
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info
Joseph Brant Judkins
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EVA MAZE
Represented By
George M. Clarke, III
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info
Joseph Brant Judkins
Baker & Mckenzie, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/25/2016. (lcckk2)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, September 23, 2016
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 12:10 PM
USCA Case Number 16-5265 for21 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NANCY R. BLUMENKRANTZ, KEVIN A. MUENCH, MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN, SUZANNE BATRA, MARIE M. GREEN, MAY F. MUENCH, HAROLD D. BLUMENKRANTZ, EVA MAZE. (td)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
22 22 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 7:24 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re21 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
21 21 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to20 Memorandum & Opinion,19 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by SUZANNE BATRA, HAROLD D. BLUMENKRANTZ, NANCY R. BLUMENKRANTZ, MARIE M. GREEN, MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN, EVA MAZE, KEVIN A. MUENCH, MAY F. MUENCH. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4680741. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Clarke, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2016
20 20 order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 3:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re:19 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/25/2016. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 3:47 PM
ORDERED granting Defendants'9 Motion to Dismiss filed in Maze v. Internal Revenue Service (15-cv-1806), which binds all parties to this consolidated action; dismissing this consolidated action for want of subject matter jurisdiction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1); and dismissing this consolidated action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/25/2016. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Mon 2:35 PM
ORDER granting (17) Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:15-cv-01806-CKK (Maze v. Internal Revenue Service) and granting (12) Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:16-cv-01085-CKK (Green v. Internal Revenue Service). See document for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/25/2016. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
17 17 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 12:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-1806 and 16-cv-1085, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN (Hagerman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hagerman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
15 15 misc Administrative Record Fri 2:09 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by SUZANNE BATRA, MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN, EVA MAZE.(Judkins, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1,
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2,
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3,
Att: 4 Appendix Part 4,
Att: 5 Appendix Part 5,
Att: 6 Appendix Part 6
Monday, April 25, 2016
14 14 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 7:31 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Hagerman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Assoc. of Irritated Residents v. EPA
Monday, April 04, 2016
13 13 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 3:40 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SUZANNE BATRA, MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN, EVA MAZE.(Clarke, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Milan K. Patel and Exhibits,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of William A. Sweeney and Exhibits,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 10, 2016
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 8:40 AM
NOTICE of filing of certification of administrative record with index by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hunsader, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 7:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Brant Judkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Judkins, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 9:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefs re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed no later than APRIL 4, 2016, and Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than APRIL 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/8/2016. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 12:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/4/2016; Reply due by 4/25/2016; regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (dot)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 4:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Hunsader, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 25, 2016
9 9 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 6:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Klimas, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 19, 2016
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 11:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a List of the Contents of the Administrative Record by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Klimas, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 1:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a List of the Contents of the Administrative Record. Defendants shall file a list of the contents of the administrative record no later than MARCH 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/19/2016. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2015
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Defendants'7 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. This is Defendants' first request for an extension in this case. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by no later than FEBRUARY 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/11/2015. (lcckk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 5:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Hagerman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order extending answer deadline through February 25, 2015.
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Jeremy Hagerman on behalf of All Defendants (Hagerman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Fri 10:14 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2015.) (See Docket Entry3 to view document). (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2015
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 6:46 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 10/29/2015; INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER served on 10/29/2015; JOHN KOSKINEN served on 10/29/2015; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/29/2015 (Clarke, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2015
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER, JOHN KOSKINEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
Related: [-]
2 2 order .Order Tue 9:54 AM
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 27, 2015. (NS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4291939) filed by EVA MAZE, MARGOT LICHTENSTEIN, SUZANNE BATRA.(Clarke, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to IRS,
Att: 3 Summons to Commissioner of IRS,
Att: 4 Summons to AG,
Att: 5 Summons to USAO DDC
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 2:20 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md)
Related: [-]