Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01186
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jan 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Associated Footwear
10859 Midwest Industrial Blvd.
St. Louis, MO 63132
Represented By
Associated Footwear
contact info
Plaintiff
Footwear #19 Plus
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/12 4:29 PM
Disposition of Adversary Number 15-1186 Dismissed Complaint. (el)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/12 4:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1186 Closed (el)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
5 5 notice Notice Mon 01/11 5:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Footwear #19 Plus (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, December 05, 2015
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause
Thursday, December 03, 2015
3 3 order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/03 10:33 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 Re:2 Summons Issued. THE COURT HAVING ISSUED A SUMMONS HEREIN ON OCTOBER 30, 2015, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAVING FILED NEITHER A RETURN OF SERVICE NOR A REQUEST FOR AN ALIAS SUMMONS, THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION AND FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS WITHIN A REASONABLE TIME. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2015. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 2:37 PM
Summons Issued on Associated Footwear Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:30 PM
Adversary case 15-01186 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Associated Footwear. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01186 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1