Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01187
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Mar 04, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bay Sales, Inc.
113 Fillmore Street
Bristol, PA 19007
Represented By
Bay Sales, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Paperworks #19, Inc.
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 04, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/04 9:04 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01187 Complaint dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/04 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1187 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/21 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order
Thursday, February 18, 2016
19 19 order Order Thu 02/18 1:45 PM
Order dated 2/18/20161 Complaint. IN LIGHT OF THE FILING OF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL [#18], THE STATUS CONFERECNE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 2, 2016 AT 9:15 A.M. IS HEREBY CANCELLED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 02/17 6:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Defendant Bay Sales, Inc. and Plaintiff Paperworks #19, Inc. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Paperworks #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 28, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/29 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
16 16 order Order Tue 01/26 3:48 PM
Order dated 1/26/2016 Re:1 Complaint. STATUS CONFERENCE HELD. A FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MARCH 2, 2016 AT 9:15 A.M. ATTORNEY JOHN LUCIEN AND JOSEPH PATRY ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Tue 01/26 3:50 PM
Status Conference continued to 3/2/2016 at 09:15 AM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA. Re:1 Complaint. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 01/07 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order
Monday, January 04, 2016
14 14 order Order Mon 01/04 10:18 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/4/2016 Re:13 Request for Telephonic Appearance at Status Conference Re:1 Complaint filed by Defendant Bay Sales, Inc. GRANTED. ATTORNEY JOSEPH PATRY MAY USE THE FOLLOWING DIAL-IN INFORMATION AT THE APPOINTED TIME FOR HEARING: 617-748-6691, PASSCODE 123456. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2015
13 13 misc Request for Telephonic Hearing Thu 12/31 2:12 PM
Request for Telephonic Appearance at Status Conference with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Defendant Bay Sales, Inc. (Patry, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by Paperworks #19, Inc. against Bay Sales, Inc.
Friday, December 25, 2015
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 12/26 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Hearing Scheduled
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
11 11 misc Statement Wed 12/23 3:45 PM
Defendant's Statement in support of jury trial Related [+] filed by Defendant Bay Sales, Inc. (Patry, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Order
10 10 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Wed 12/23 10:31 AM
Status Conference to be held on 1/26/2016 at 10:00 AM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:1 Complaint by Paperworks #19, Inc. against Bay Sales, Inc. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference. (mem)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
9 9 misc Statement Mon 12/21 6:26 PM
Statement with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Paperworks #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Pre-Trial Order
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
6 6 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 12/07 10:40 AM
Pre-Trial Order RE:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Paperworks #19, Inc. Discovery Complete by : March 7, 2016; Joint Pre-Trial Statement by April 7, 2016. See Order for further information. (jreg)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Mon 12/07 10:38 AM
Order dated 12/7/2015 Re:4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Bay Sales, Inc. THE DEFENDANT HAS DEMANDED A JURY TRIAL ON ALL ISSUES PROPERLY TRIABLE THEREBY. A BANKRUPTCY JUDGE MAY CONDUCT A JURY TRIAL ONLY WHERE THE RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL APPLIES IN THE PROCEEDING AND ALL PARTIES EXPRESSLY CONSENT TO THE BANKRUPTCY JUDGE'S CONDUCTING THE JURY TRIAL. 28 U.S.C. SECTION 157(E). IN ORDER TO DETERMINE WHETHER THERE EXISTS A RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL WITH RESPECT TO EACH COUNT OF THE COMPLAINT AND, IF SO, WHETHER THIS COURT MAY CONDUCT THE JURY TRIAL, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT EACH PARTY SHALL FILE, ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 21, 2015, A STATEMENT INDICATING THE FOLLOWING: 1. WITH RESPECT TO EACH COUNT IN THE COMPLAINT, A STATEMENT OF THAT PARTY'S POSITION AS TO WHETHER THERE EXISTS A RIGHT TO TRIAL BY JURY, AND (IN THE CASE OF THE DEFENDANT ONLY), IF SO, A CITATION TO AUTHORITY ESTABLISHING THE RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL WITH RESPECT TO THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THAT COUNT; 2. WHETHER THE PARTY CONSENTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 157(E) TO THIS BANKRUPTCY COURT CONDUCTING A JURY TRIAL; 3. WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ABSTAIN UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1334(C)(1) FROM ADJUDICATING THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IF THE COURT DETERMINES THAT THE DEFENDANT HAS A RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL BUT, FOR LACK OF CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES, THIS COURT CANNOT CONDUCT THE JURY TRIAL. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/30 11:02 AM
Answer Re:1 Complaint with certificate of service filed by Bay Sales, Inc.. (Patry, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bay Sales, Inc. 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 2:41 PM
Summons Issued on Bay Sales, Inc. Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:36 PM
Adversary case 15-01187 Complaint by Paperworks #19, Inc. against Bay Sales, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01187 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1