Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01188
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jan 20, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Boston Globe Advertising
135 Morrissey Blvd.
Boston, MA 02125
Represented By
Boston Globe Advertising
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, January 20, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/20 12:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01188 dismissed Complaint (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/20 12:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1188 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
31 31 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/05 2:49 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising, Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/02 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion for Approval
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
29 29 order Order on Motion for Approval Tue 11/29 10:46 AM
Endorsed Order dated 11/29/2016 Re:26 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:25 Stipulation. THIS MOTION HAS ALSO BEEN FILED IN THE LEAD CASE. THE COURT WILL NOT TAKE ACTION ON THIS MOTION AND WILL ENTER AN ORDER IN THE LEAD CASE IN THE ORDINARY COURSE. (jreg)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 11/29 10:26 AM
Endorsed Order dated 11/29/2016 Re:24 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 27, 2017. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/23 12:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation,26 Motion to Approve
26 26 motion Approve Wed 11/23 12:04 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:25 Stipulation]. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 11/23 12:02 PM
Stipulation By Defendant Boston Globe Advertising, Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Related [+] filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising, Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 18, 2016
24 24 motion Extend Time Fri 11/18 2:23 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum [Re:20 Order] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
23 23 order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 05/17 2:27 PM
Endorsed Order dated 5/17/2016 Re:22 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising to Extend Time to File Documents. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MAY 24, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
22 22 motion Extend Time Fri 05/13 12:52 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:20 Order] with certificate of service. (Aframe, Carl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/21 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order
Friday, April 15, 2016
20 20 order Order Mon 04/18 9:48 AM
Order dated 4/15/2016 Re:19 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN IS APPROVED AND THE DEADLINES ARE MODIFIED ACCORDINGLY. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS NOVEMBER 18, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 04/15 2:55 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising, Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 16 Order
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/03 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/03 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Generic Motion
Monday, February 29, 2016
16 16 order Order Mon 02/29 1:02 PM
Pre-Trial Order dated 2/29/2016 Re:1 Complaint. Discovery due by 5/31/2016. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 6/30/2016. See Pretrial Order for complete text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Generic Motion Mon 02/29 12:49 PM
Order dated 2/29/2016 Re:14 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising to Vacate Default and File Answer Late. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE MOTION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT IS HEREBY ALLOWED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 02/24 4:38 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising to Vacate Default and File Answer Late with certificate of service. (Aframe, Carl)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/24 4:24 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Boston Globe Advertising. (Aframe, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/19 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Carl D. Aframe with certificate of service filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising (Aframe, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/13 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
10 10 order Order Wed 02/10 2:00 PM
Order dated 2/10/2016 Re:2 Summons Issued. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON JANUARY 12, 2016, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 24, 2016: (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
9 9 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Tue 01/12 4:46 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] (el)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Boston Globe Advertising
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 01/12 4:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Boston Globe Advertising. (el)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/04 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/03/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion for Approval
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/03 12:25 PM
Boston Globe Advertising Answer Deadline Reset for 1/8/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Approval Tue 12/01 3:43 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/1/2015 Re:5 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:4 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 8, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
5 5 motion Approve Mon 11/30 2:44 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:4 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 11/30 2:43 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Boston Globe Advertising to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on Boston Globe Advertising 11/17/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 2:44 PM
Summons Issued on Boston Globe Advertising Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:40 PM
Adversary case 15-01188 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Boston Globe Advertising. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01188 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1