Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01190
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Aug 05, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Citizens Bank
28 State Street
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Citizens Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, August 05, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 08/05 10:16 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01190 Complaint allowed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/05 10:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1190 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/08 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
6 6 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 07/05 10:22 AM
Order dated 7/5/2016 Re:5 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Default and Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Citizens Bank. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
5 5 motion Default Wed 06/01 3:51 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Default and Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Citizens Bank with certificate of service (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit;
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Default Judgment;
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/03 12:24 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Citizens Bank (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Citizens Bank 11/18/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on Citizens Bank Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:45 PM
Adversary case 15-01190 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Citizens Bank. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01190 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1