Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01193
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Nov 08, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Grid
25 Research Drive
Westborough, MA 01582
Represented By
National Grid
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 11/08 8:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01193 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/08 8:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1193 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 7:04 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant National Grid (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
court Entry Wed 10/05 11:13 AM
Clerk's Entry: An Order approving the Stipulation was entered in the main case 13-16429 on 10/5/2016 at docket number #775. On or before 11/4/2016, the parties shall file either a stipulation od dismissal or a status report in Adversary Proceeding 15-1193 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2016
court Entry Mon 09/19 8:03 AM
Motion to Approve Stipulation filed in main case 13-16429 at docket number #758. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 17, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/18 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order
Friday, April 15, 2016
17 17 order Order Fri 04/15 9:21 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/15/2016 Re:16 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN IS HEREBY APPROVED. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 11, 2016. THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 18, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
16 16 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Wed 04/13 5:33 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant National Grid (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 14 Order
Thursday, March 03, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/04 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order
Monday, February 29, 2016
14 14 order Order Tue 03/01 11:28 AM
Pre-Trial Order dated 2/29/2016 Re:1 Complaint. Discovery due by 5/31/2016. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 6/29/2016. See Pretrial Order for complete text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/29 10:10 AM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by National Grid. (Powers, Mark)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 07, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/08 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/08 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Generic Motion
Friday, February 05, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Default Fri 02/05 10:50 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/5/2016 RE:7 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment on Defendant National Grid filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. DENIED AS THE PLAINTIFF HAS ASSENTED TO THE COURT VACATING THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT. (nc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Generic Motion Fri 02/05 10:36 AM
Order dated 2/5/2016 RE:8 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant National Grid To Vacate Entry of Default and Establish Answer Deadline. GRANTED. THE COURT SHALL VACATE THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE FEBRUARY 29, 2016. (nc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 02/04 1:34 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant National Grid To Vacate Entry of Default and Establish Answer Deadline with certificate of service. (Powers, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
crtretm Court Returned Mail Wed 01/27 8:26 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:5 Order returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for National Grid, 25 Research Drive, Westborough, MA 01581. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
7 7 motion Default Thu 01/21 1:27 PM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment on Defendant National Grid filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A;
Att: 2 Exhibit B;
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Saturday, January 02, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/03 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Thursday, December 31, 2015
5 5 order Order Thu 12/31 4:39 PM
Order dated 12/31/2015 RE:2 Summons Issued on National Grid. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON DECEMBER 3, 2015, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 21, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (nc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/03 12:21 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to National Grid (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Grid 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on National Grid Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:53 PM
Adversary case 15-01193 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against National Grid. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01193 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1