Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01194
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Mar 01, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
NEJ, Inc.
170 Pinesbridge Road
Beacon Falls, CT 64030
Represented By
NEJ, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/01 11:39 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01194 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/01 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1194 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 13, 2016
12 12 notice Notice Sat 02/13 10:18 AM
Notice of Dismissal with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, January 01, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/02 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Approval
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
10 10 order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 12/30 9:40 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/30/2015 Re:9 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:8 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 29, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 12/30 9:41 AM
Answer Deadline Reset for 2/29/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
9 9 motion Approve Tue 12/29 5:37 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:8 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 12/29 5:36 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and NEJ, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 27, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/28 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/27/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion for Approval
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 11/25 10:19 AM
Order dated 11/25/2015 Re:5 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:4 Stipulation. THE STIPULATION IS HEREBY APPROVED; THE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND IS ACCORDINGLY EXTENDED TO DECEMBER 30, 2015. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 11/25 10:19 AM
NEJ, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 12/30/2015 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
5 5 motion Approve Tue 11/24 3:42 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:4 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 11/24 3:41 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and NEJ, Inc. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on NEJ, Inc. 11/17/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 3:29 PM
Summons Issued on NEJ, Inc. Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:56 PM
Adversary case 15-01194 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against NEJ, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01194 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1