Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01195
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Sep 01, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
New Horizon Communications
420 Bedford Street Suite 250
Lexington, MA 02420
Represented By
New Horizon Communications
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, September 01, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 09/01 3:53 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01195 Dismissing Complaint. (jlavalley, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/01 3:54 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1195 Closed. (jlavalley, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 08/31 4:07 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant New Horizon Communications of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant New Horizon Communications (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 26, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/27 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
17 17 order Order Wed 02/24 8:57 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/23/2016 Re:16 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. THE PROPOSED PRETRIAL DEADLINES ARE HEREBY APPROVED. ACCORDINGLY, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 17, 2016 AND THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 31, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
16 16 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Mon 02/22 6:10 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant New Horizon Communications (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Order
Sunday, January 24, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/25 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/25 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Order
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/25 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Generic Motion
Friday, January 22, 2016
12 12 order Order on Motion for Default Fri 01/22 3:14 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/22/2016 Re:9 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Entry of Default and Default Judgment on Defendant(s) New Horizon Communications. DENIED. THE DEFAULT HAS BEEN VACATED AND THE DEFENDANT HAS FILED AN ANSWER. (jreg)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 01/22 3:12 PM
Pre-Trial Order dated 1/22/2016 Re:1 Complaint. Discovery due by 4/22/2016. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 5/23/2016. See Order for Complete Text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Generic Motion Fri 01/22 3:09 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/22/2016 Re:7 Assented to Motion to Vacate Default filed by Defendant New Horizon Communications. GRANTED. THE COURT WILL VACATE THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
9 9 motion Default Thu 01/21 2:41 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Entry of Default and Default Judgment on Defendant(s) New Horizon Communications (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A;
Att: 2 Exhibit B;
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/21 2:17 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by New Horizon Communications. (Glickman, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 01/21 1:58 PM
Assented to Motion to Vacate Default filed by Defendant New Horizon Communications with certificate of service. (Glickman, Paul)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 02, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/03 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Thursday, December 31, 2015
5 5 order Order Thu 12/31 4:41 PM
Order dated 12/31/2015 RE:2 Summons Issued on New Horizon Communications. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON DECEMBER 3, 2015, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 21, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT (nc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/03 12:20 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to New Horizon Communications (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on New Horizon Communications 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/30 3:46 PM
Summons Issued on New Horizon Communications Answer Due 11/30/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 1:58 PM
Adversary case 15-01195 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against New Horizon Communications. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/30 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-01195 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15081648, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1