Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01198
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Apr 04, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
PSNH
107 Selden Street
Berlin, CT 06037
Represented By
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/04 9:12 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01198 Complaint dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/04 9:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1198 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2017
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/20 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order
Friday, March 17, 2017
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/18 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Order to Show Cause
40 40 order Order Fri 03/17 2:04 PM
Order dated 3/17/2017 Re:36 Order to Show Cause dated 3/15/2017. IN LIGHT OF THE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED BY THE PARTIES, THE ORDER TO SHOW CASE IS HEREBY RELEASED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/17 11:44 AM
Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (Morrissey, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
38 38 utility Corrective Entry Wed 03/15 1:50 PM
Order Requiring Corrective Action. You are hereby ORDERED to file the required document(s) identified in the attached order within (2) business days of the date of this order Related [+] Document is unsigned. (jreg)
Related: [-] 37 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc.
37 37 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/15 1:44 PM
DISREGARD: Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (Morrissey, Francis) Document is unsigned. Modified on 3/15/2017 (jreg)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order to Show Cause Wed 03/15 10:02 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 3/15/2017 Re:34 Notice of Inactivity. THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, ON OR BEFORE MARCH 17, 2017, AS TO WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Thu 02/16 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Notice of Inactivity
Monday, February 13, 2017
34 34 court Notice of Inactivity Mon 02/13 12:04 PM
Notice of Inactivity. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/09 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
32 32 order Order Wed 07/06 11:08 AM
Order dated 7/6/2016 Re:30 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Objection Re:25 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. AS THE PARTIES HAVE REPORT THIS MATTER SETTLED, THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEBTOR TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS CONTINUED GENERALLY. IN THE EVENT A SETTLEMENT IS NOT FINALIZED, UPON THE FILING OF A STATUS REPORT BY THE PARTIES, THE COURT WILL SET A RESPONSE DEADLINE. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
31 31 order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 06/07 2:40 PM
Order dated 6/7/2016 Re:30 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Objection Re:25 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JUNE 27, 2016. AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL HAS REPORTED THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SETTLED, PENDING THE FILING AND RESOLUTION OF A MOTION TO APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT, THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 28, 2016 IS CONTINUED GENERALLY. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
30 30 motion Extend Time Mon 06/06 6:15 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Objection [Re:25 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding] with certificate of service. (Morrissey, Francis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 14, 2016
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 05/15 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/14/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Hearing Scheduled
Thursday, May 12, 2016
28 28 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Thu 05/12 1:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Defendant PSNH (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
27 27 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Thu 05/12 9:13 AM
Hearing Scheduled for 6/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:25 Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint. Objections due by 6/7/2016 at 04:30 PM. (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
26 26 misc Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of) Mon 05/09 11:00 AM
Brief/Memorandum In Support of Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
25 25 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/09 10:58 AM
Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] with certificate of service. (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/14 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Generic Motion
Monday, April 11, 2016
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 04/11 9:38 AM
PSNH Answer Deadline Reset for 5/9/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
23 23 order Order on Generic Motion Mon 04/11 9:36 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/8/2016 Re:22 Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Set Aside Default and Extend Time To Respond to Complaint. GRANTED. THE COURT WILL REMOVE THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MAY 9, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 04/07 4:36 PM
Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Set Aside Default and Extend Time To Respond to Complaint to May 9, 2016 with certificate of service. (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
21 21 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/05 7:50 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant PSNH. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/31 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Monday, March 28, 2016
19 19 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/28 9:51 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/28/2016 Re:7 Motion filed by Donald Ethan Jeffery to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor Building #19, Inc. NO OBJECTIONS FILED. THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS HEREBY ALLOWED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
18 18 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/25 4:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Francis C. Morrissey with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (Morrissey, Francis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 05, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/06 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/05/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Generic Motion
Thursday, March 03, 2016
16 16 order Order on Generic Motion Thu 03/03 9:22 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/3/2016 Re:15 Second Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING APRIL 1, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 03/03 9:22 AM
PSNH Answer Deadline Reset for 4/1/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 03/02 12:08 PM
Second Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint with certificate of service. (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 13, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/14 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
13 13 order Order Thu 02/11 10:42 AM
Order dated 2/10/2016 Re:7 Motion filed by Donald Ethan Jeffery to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor Building #19, Inc. THE COURT NOTES THAT THE APPLICATION TO EMPLOY SPECIAL COUNSEL FILED IN THE DEBTOR'S MAIN BANKRUPTCY CASE HAS BEEN APPROVED [SEE DOCKET #525 IN CASE NO. 13-16429 . UPON THE FILING OF AN APPEARANCE BY SUCCESSOR COUNSEL IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, THE COURT WILL GRANT THIS MOTION. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 02/02 7:53 AM
PSNH Answer Deadline Reset for 3/2/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
12 12 order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 02/01 5:03 PM
Endorsed Order dated 2/1/2016 RE:11 Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Extend Time to Respond [RE:3 Stipulation]. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 2, 2016. (nc)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extend Time Mon 02/01 2:43 PM
Motion filed by Defendant PSNH to Extend Time to Respond [Re:3 Stipulation]. (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/01 2:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Honor S. Heath filed by Defendant PSNH (Heath, Honor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2015
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/11 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/10/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
8 8 order Order Tue 12/08 3:23 PM
Order dated 12/8/2015 Re:7 Motion filed by Donald Ethan Jeffery to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor Building #19, Inc. THE COURT WILL ACT ON THE INSTANT MOTION WHEN SUCCESSOR COUNSEL FILES AN APPEARANCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. (jreg)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 12/08 9:58 AM
Motion filed by Donald Ethan Jeffery to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor Building #19, Inc. with certificate of service. (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Saturday, December 05, 2015
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion for Approval
Thursday, December 03, 2015
5 5 order Order on Motion for Approval Thu 12/03 11:11 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/3/2015 Re:4 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:3 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE TIME TO RESPOND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 1, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/03 12:17 PM
PSNH Answer Deadline Reset for 2/1/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
4 4 motion Approve Tue 12/01 6:39 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:3 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Stipulation Tue 12/01 6:39 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and PSNH to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 8:46 AM
Summons Issued on PSNH Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:04 PM
Adversary case 15-01198 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against PSNH. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]