Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01200
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Apr 19, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Table Talk Pies, Inc.
120 Washington Street
Worcester, MA 02109
Represented By
Table Talk Pies, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/19 8:27 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01200 Complaint Dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/19 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1200 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 04/04 10:00 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Table Talk Pies, Inc. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, December 05, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, December 03, 2015
6 6 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 12/03 2:37 PM
Pre-Trial Order dated 12/3/2015 Re:1 Complaint. Discovery due by 3/3/2016. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 4/4/2016. See Order for Complete Text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/01 10:36 AM
Answer Re:1 Complaint with certificate of service filed by Table Talk Pies, Inc..(Foss, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Table Talk Pies, Inc. 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 11/20 2:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Table Talk Pies, Inc. 11/11/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 8:55 AM
Summons Issued on Table Talk Pies, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:07 PM
Adversary case 15-01200 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Table Talk Pies, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]