Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01201
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Dec 28, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Providence Journal Company
75 Fountain Street
Providence, RI 02940
Represented By
The Providence Journal Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 12/28 7:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01201 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/28 7:42 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1201 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/16 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/15/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order
Monday, December 12, 2016
17 17 order Order Tue 12/13 7:31 AM
Order dated 12/12/2016 Re:13 Order to Show Cause dated 12/6/2016. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [#13] IS HEREBY RELEASED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/12 11:54 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant The Providence Journal Company (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Response Mon 12/12 11:53 AM
Response with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Re:13 Order to Show Cause dated 12/6/2016. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/10 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order to Show Cause
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
13 13 order Order to Show Cause Wed 12/07 7:10 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 12/6/2016. THE PARTIES HAVING BEEN ORDERED TO FILE A JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 2, 2016; AND BOTH PARTIES HAVING FAILED TO FILE EITHER A JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM OR, IN LIEU OF A JOINT MEMORANDUM, SEPARATE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA; AND THE PLAINTIFF BEARING THE BURDEN OF PROOF AS TO THE RELIEF SOUGHT IN THE COMPLAINT, THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. RESPONSES TO THIS ORDER SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 20, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2016
12 12 order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 10/28 8:02 AM
Endorsed Order dated 10/27/2016 Re:11 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Pre-Trial Deadline. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 2, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extend Time Thu 10/27 2:26 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Pre-Trial Deadline [Re:9 Order] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/21 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order
Thursday, February 18, 2016
9 9 order Order Thu 02/18 12:07 PM
Endorsed Order dated 2/18/2016 Re:8 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. THE PROPOSED PRETRIAL DEADLINES ARE HEREBY APPROVED. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 14, 2016 AND THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 28, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
8 8 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Wed 02/17 6:39 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant The Providence Journal Company (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Disclosure Tue 02/16 9:40 AM
Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Automatic Disclosures filed by Defendant The Providence Journal Company (Anderson, Jon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 12/07 10:08 AM
Pre-Trial Order RE:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Discovery Complete by : March 7, 2016; Joint Pre-Trial Statement by April 7, 2016. See Order for further information. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/03 8:31 AM
Answer Re:1 Complaint with certificate of service filed by The Providence Journal Company . (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Providence Journal Company 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:01 AM
Summons Issued on The Providence Journal Company Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:09 PM
Adversary case 15-01201 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against The Providence Journal Company. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]