Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01202
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Aug 04, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Unisource Management Corp.
308 Central Street
Hudson, MA 01749
Represented By
Unisource Management Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 04, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 08/04 9:53 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01202 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/04 9:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1202 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 07/20 9:27 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Unisource Management Corp Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 11, 2016
court Entry Mon 07/11 8:43 AM
Clerk's Entry: Motion to Approve Stipulation #617 filed in main case 13-16429 on 6/15/2016 has been allowed. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a status report in adversary case 15-01202 on or before 7/22/2016. See Order #651 in main case 13-16429 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/22 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
8 8 order Order Tue 01/19 5:04 PM
Order dated 1/19/2016 Re:7 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Defendant Unisource Management Corp., Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. THE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES ARE HEREBY AMENDED AS PROPOSED. ACCORDINGLY, THE JOINT PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 28, 2016. (el)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 01/15 4:49 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Unisource Management Corp. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Unisource Management Corp. 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/20 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/19/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
4 4 order Pre-Trial Order Tue 11/17 11:06 AM
Pre-Trial Order dated 11/17/2015 Re:1 Complaint. Discovery due by 2/17/2016. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 3/17/2016. See Order for Complete Text. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2015
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/16 3:26 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Unisource Management Corp.. (Jachowicz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:04 AM
Summons Issued on Unisource Management Corp. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:10 PM
Adversary case 15-01202 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Unisource Management Corp.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]