Building #19, Inc. v. Volume Apparel Group
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-01203 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Volume Apparel Group
49 Rose Street
Stoughton, MA 02072 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/17 8:06 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01203 Complaint dismissed. (jreg) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/17 8:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1203 Closed (jreg) |
||
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/14/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Endorsed Order dated 1/12/2016 Re:9 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve8 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 29, 2016. (el) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:8 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Volume Apparel Group to Extend Deadline to Respond filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
Friday, November 27, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/27/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Endorsed Order dated 11/25/2015 Re:5 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:4 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 8, 2016. (jreg) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Wed 11/25 8:44 AM
Volume Apparel Group Answer Deadline Reset for 1/8/2016 (jreg) |
||
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:4 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Volume Apparel Group filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on Volume Apparel Group 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Volume Apparel Group Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 15-01203 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Volume Apparel Group. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald) |