Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01204
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jan 27, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Google, Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Google, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/27 1:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01204 Complaint dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/27 1:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1204 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 01/11 6:11 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Google, Inc. of Dismissal Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 03, 2015
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/03 12:14 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Google, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Google, Inc. 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 11/20 2:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Google, Inc. 11/11/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:11 AM
Summons Issued on Google, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:14 PM
Adversary case 15-01204 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Google, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]