Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01205
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jun 23, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Liquidity Services, Inc.
741 E. Ball Road Suite 200
Anaheim, CA 92805
Represented By
Liquidity Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, June 23, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 06/23 8:35 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01205 Complaint dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/23 8:35 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1205 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
23 23 notice Notice Wed 06/08 3:56 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, June 04, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/05 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
21 21 order Order Thu 06/02 8:09 AM
Order dated 6/1/2016 Re:2 Summons Issued. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON MAY 2, 2016, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE JUNE 15, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
20 20 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 05/02 1:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Liquidity Services, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/02 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion for Approval
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
18 18 order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 03/30 2:34 PM
Endorsed Order dated 3/30/2016 Re:17 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:16 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING APRIL 29, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Approve Wed 03/30 11:08 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:16 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 03/30 11:07 AM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Liquidity Services, Inc. to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 03/30 2:36 PM
Answer Deadline Reset for 4/29/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/04 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Approval
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
14 14 order Order on Motion for Approval Tue 03/01 10:00 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/1/2016 Re:13 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:12 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 30, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 03/01 10:01 AM
Liquidity Services, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 3/30/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
13 13 motion Approve Mon 02/29 3:34 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:12 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 02/29 3:33 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Liquidity Services, Inc. to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, January 10, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/11 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Approval
Friday, January 08, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Approval Fri 01/08 10:18 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/8/2016 Re:9 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:8 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 29, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 01/08 10:18 AM
Liquidity Services, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 2/29/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
9 9 motion Approve Thu 01/07 6:16 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:8 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 01/07 6:15 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Liquidity Services, Inc. to Extend Deadline to Respond Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 27, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/28 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/27/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion for Approval
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 11/25 12:42 PM
Endorsed Order dated 11/25/2015 Re:5 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve Re:4 Stipulation. GRANTED. THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 8, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Approve Wed 11/25 9:08 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Approve [Re:4 Stipulation] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 11/25 9:08 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. and Liquidity Services, Inc. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 11/25 12:43 PM
Liquidity Services, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 1/8/2016 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Liquidity Services, Inc. 11/17/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:14 AM
Summons Issued on Liquidity Services, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:16 PM
Adversary case 15-01205 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Liquidity Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]