Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01206
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Sep 01, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dalton Rug Textile
2361 S. Riverbend Road
Dalton, GA 30721
Represented By
Dalton Rug Textile
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation Tue 01/17 1:55 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation filed by Defendant Dalton Rug Textile (Lipton, Marques)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 09/01 10:22 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01206 Dismissing Complaint. (jlavalley, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/01 10:24 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1206 Closed. (jlavalley, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 08/30 11:09 AM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Dalton Rug Textile of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Dalton Rug Textile (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, February 20, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/21 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order
Thursday, February 18, 2016
13 13 order Order Thu 02/18 3:33 PM
Endorsed Order dated 2/18/2016 Re:12 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN IS APPROVED AND THE DEADLINES ARE MODIFIED ACCORDINGLY. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE JOINT PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM IS AUGUST 31, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Tue 02/16 10:25 AM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc., Defendant Dalton Rug Textile (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, December 31, 2015
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 12/31 7:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Marques C Lipton with certificate of service filed by Defendant Dalton Rug Textile (Lipton, Marques)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Pre-Trial Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
8 8 order Order Mon 12/07 10:55 AM
Order dated 12/7/2015 Re:3 Order to Show Cause. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS HEREBY RELEASED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 12/07 10:25 AM
Pre-Trial Order RE:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Discovery Complete by : March 7, 2016; Joint Pre-Trial Statement by April 7, 2016. See Order for further information. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2015
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause
Thursday, December 03, 2015
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/03 12:02 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Dalton Rug Textile . (jreg)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/03 11:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Dalton Rug Textile 11/18/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/03 10:32 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 Re:2 Summons Issued. THE COURT HAVING ISSUED A SUMMONS HEREIN ON NOVEMBER, 2, 2015, 2015, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAVING FILED NEITHER A RETURN OF SERVICE NOR A REQUEST FOR AN ALIAS SUMMONS, THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION AND FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS WITHIN A REASONABLE TIME. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2015. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:17 AM
Summons Issued on Dalton Rug Textile Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:18 PM
Adversary case 15-01206 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Dalton Rug Textile. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]