Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01207
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Feb 24, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dynamic Rugs
4845 Governors Way
Frederick, MD 21704
Represented By
Dynamic Rugs
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/24 8:11 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01207 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/24 8:11 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1207 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/09 6:35 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice Wed 01/20 12:31 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/20/2016 Re:14 Motion filed by Ryan C. Siden on behalf of Roland Gary Jones to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant Dynamic Rugs. NO OBJECTIONS FILED. GRANTED. (el)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 01/19 9:06 AM
Receipt Number phv-27793-1452882329 RE:16 Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice). Fee Amount $100.00 (nc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) Tue 01/05 7:27 AM
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Roland Gary Jones representing Dynamic Rugs. PHV Fee in the amount of $100.00 Due 1/15/2016. Related [+] (jreg)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Monday, January 04, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/04 4:19 PM
Certificate of Service of Dynamic Rugs Initial Disclosures and Discovery Demands filed by Defendant Dynamic Rugs (Siden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 01/04 4:15 PM
Motion filed by Ryan C. Siden on behalf of Roland Gary Jones to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant Dynamic Rugs with certificate of service. (Siden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification of Roland Gary Jones
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/24 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/23/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order
Monday, December 21, 2015
12 12 order Order Mon 12/21 1:00 PM
Order dated 12/21/2015 Re:11 Amended5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Dynamic Rugs. AS THE AMENDED ANSWER CONTAINS NO JURY DEMAND, THE PARTIES ARE HEREBY RELEASED FROM THE COURT'S ORDER [#7]. ALL PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES SET FOR IN THE COURT'S PRE-TRIAL ORDER [#8] WILL REMAIN IN PLACE SUBJECT TO ANY FUTURE REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 20, 2015
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 12/20 8:10 PM
Amended 5 Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Dynamic Rugs.(Siden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Pre-Trial Order
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/10 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
8 8 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 12/07 10:29 AM
Pre-Trial Order RE:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Discovery Complete by : March 7, 2016; Joint Pre-Trial Statement by April 7, 2016. See Order for further information. (jreg)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Mon 12/07 10:28 AM
Order dated 12/7/2015 Re:5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Dynamic Rugs. THE DEFENDANT HAS DEMANDED A JURY TRIAL ON ALL ISSUES PROPERLY TRIABLE THEREBY. A BANKRUPTCY JUDGE MAY CONDUCT A JURY TRIAL ONLY WHERE THE RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL APPLIES IN THE PROCEEDING AND ALL PARTIES EXPRESSLY CONSENT TO THE BANKRUPTCY JUDGE'S CONDUCTING THE JURY TRIAL. 28 U.S.C. SECTION 157(E). IN ORDER TO DETERMINE WHETHER THERE EXISTS A RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL WITH RESPECT TO EACH COUNT OF THE COMPLAINT AND, IF SO, WHETHER THIS COURT MAY CONDUCT THE JURY TRIAL, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT EACH PARTY SHALL FILE, ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 21, 2015, A STATEMENT INDICATING THE FOLLOWING: 1. WITH RESPECT TO EACH COUNT IN THE COMPLAINT, A STATEMENT OF THAT PARTY'S POSITION AS TO WHETHER THERE EXISTS A RIGHT TO TRIAL BY JURY, AND (IN THE CASE OF THE DEFENDANT ONLY), IF SO, A CITATION TO AUTHORITY ESTABLISHING THE RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL WITH RESPECT TO THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THAT COUNT; 2. WHETHER THE PARTY CONSENTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 157(E) TO THIS BANKRUPTCY COURT CONDUCTING A JURY TRIAL; 3. WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ABSTAIN UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1334(C)(1) FROM ADJUDICATING THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IF THE COURT DETERMINES THAT THE DEFENDANT HAS A RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL BUT, FOR LACK OF CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES, THIS COURT CANNOT CONDUCT THE JURY TRIAL. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 12/03 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ryan C. Siden with certificate of service filed by Defendant Dynamic Rugs (Siden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/03 2:29 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Dynamic Rugs . (jreg)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/03 12:11 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Dynamic Rugs (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/24 1:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dynamic Rugs 11/16/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:20 AM
Summons Issued on Dynamic Rugs Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:19 PM
Adversary case 15-01207 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Dynamic Rugs. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]