Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01208
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Apr 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Korhani of Canada, Inc.
Represented By
Korhani of Canada, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/12 10:09 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01208 Complaint allowed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/12 10:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1208 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/18 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
15 15 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 03/15 10:22 AM
Order dated 3/15/2016 Re:14 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Default and for Default Judgment against Defendant Korhani of Canada, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT: THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING HAVING COME ON FOR CONSIDERATION ON THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, THE DEFENDANT HAVING FAILED TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT AND TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND, THEREFORE, CAUSE EXISTING TO GRANT THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT THE PLAINTIFF, BUILDING #19, INC., THE DEBTOR IN THIS BANKRUPTCY CASE, RECOVER OF THE DEFENDANT, KORHANI OF CANADA, INC., THE SUM OF $12,075.00, PLUS INTEREST THEREON AT THE STATUTORY RATE OF 0.68 PERCENT PER ANNUM FROM OCTOBER 30, 2015, THE DATE OF COMMENCEMENT OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
14 14 motion Default Tue 02/16 4:00 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. for Default and for Default Judgment against Defendant Korhani of Canada, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Affidavit;
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Judgment;
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
13 13 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 02/03 11:28 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/3/2016 Re:12 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEBTOR TO FILE A MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 16, 2016. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
12 12 motion Extend Time Tue 02/02 6:22 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Extend Time to File Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment [Re:10 Order] with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
10 10 order Order Wed 01/20 11:31 AM
Order dated 1/19/2016 Re:4 Summons Service Executed. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON DECEMBER 18, 2016, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 2, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (el)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 20, 2015
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 12/21 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Friday, December 18, 2015
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 12/18 7:32 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Korhani of Canada, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
7 7 order Order Fri 12/18 7:30 AM
Order dated 12/17/2015 Re:6 Response filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS HEREBY RELEASED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Response Thu 12/17 3:21 PM
Response with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Re:3 Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2015
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/03 2:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Korhani of Canada, Inc. 11/11/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/03 10:25 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 Re:2 Summons Issued. THE COURT HAVING ISSUED A SUMMONS HEREIN ON NOVEMBER 2, 2015, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAVING FILED NEITHER A RETURN OF SERVICE NOR A REQUEST FOR AN ALIAS SUMMONS, THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION AND FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS WITHIN A REASONABLE TIME. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2015. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:26 AM
Summons Issued on Korhani of Canada, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:21 PM
Adversary case 15-01208 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Korhani of Canada, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]