Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:15-ap-01210
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jun 07, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shelton Carpet, Inc.
2552 Dug Gap Road
Dalton, GA 30720
Represented By
Shelton Carpet, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St.
Hingham, MA 02043
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/07 9:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 15-01210 Complaint dismissed. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/07 9:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1210 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
21 21 notice Notice Fri 05/20 2:28 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
20 20 crtretm Court Returned Mail and Notice to Debtor Tue 05/03 9:20 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:18 Order returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for Shelton Carpet, Inc., 2752 Dug Gap Road, Dalton, GA 30720-9222. Pursuant to MLBR 2002-4, it is the responsibility of the debtor and/or debtors counsel to maintain the accuracy of the master mailing matrix and any amendments to it. The debtors attorney, or the debtor if pro se, must attempt to correct any incorrect addresses, resend the returned notices and notify the Court as to the address corrections. (jr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 24, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/25 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order
Friday, April 22, 2016
18 18 order Order Fri 04/22 11:11 AM
Order dated 4/22/2016 Re:17 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Shelton Carpet, Inc. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON MARCH 21, 2016, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE MAY 20, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
17 17 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/21 11:14 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Shelton Carpet, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
crtretm Court Returned Mail Wed 02/24 8:33 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:13 Order on Motion to Vacate returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for Shelton Carpet, Inc., 2552 Dug Gap Road, Dalton, GA 30720. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/06 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/05/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Vacate
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
15 15 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/03 1:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shelton Carpet, Inc. 2/3/2016 (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Alias Summons Issued Wed 02/03 11:45 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Shelton Carpet, Inc. Re:1 Complaint. Date Issued 2/3/2016. Answer Due 3/4/2016. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 02/03 11:43 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/3/2016 Re:12 Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Vacate Default and Issue Alias Summons. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE DEFAULT IS HEREBY VACATED AND THE COURT SHALL ISSUE AN ALIAS SUMMONS. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
12 12 motion Vacate Tue 02/02 6:21 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. to Vacate Default and Issue Alias Summons (10 Order) with certificate of service. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
10 10 order Order Wed 01/20 11:35 AM
Order dated 1/19/2016 Re:4 Summons Service Executed. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON DECEMBER 18, 2015, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 2, 2016, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (el)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
crtretm Court Returned Mail Tue 01/05 8:40 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:7 Order returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for Shelton Carpet, Inc., 2552 Dug Gap Road, Dalton, GA 30720. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
crtretm Court Returned Mail Tue 12/22 8:33 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:3 Order to Show Cause returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for Shelton Carpet, Inc., 2552 Dug Gap Road, Dalton, GA 30720. (jr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 20, 2015
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 12/21 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Friday, December 18, 2015
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 12/18 7:40 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Shelton Carpet, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
7 7 order Order Fri 12/18 7:39 AM
Order dated 12/17/2015 Re:6 Response filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS HEREBY RELEASED. (jreg)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Response Thu 12/17 3:25 PM
Response with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Building #19, Inc. Re:3 Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2015
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/03 2:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shelton Carpet, Inc. 11/11/2015 (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/03 10:17 AM
Order to Show Cause dated 12/3/2015 Re:2 Summons Issued. THE COURT HAVING ISSUED A SUMMONS HEREIN ON NOVEMBER 2, 2015, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAVING FILED NEITHER A RETURN OF SERVICE NOR A REQUEST FOR AN ALIAS SUMMONS, THE PLAINTIFF IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION AND FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS WITHIN A REASONABLE TIME. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2015. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/02 9:36 AM
Summons Issued on Shelton Carpet, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2015. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 2:24 PM
Adversary case 15-01210 Complaint by Building #19, Inc. against Shelton Carpet, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]