Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-60003

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 6:15-ap-06020
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2015
Terminated:Mar 02, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners
Represented By
John P Melko
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Tow
Tow & Koenig, PLLC 26219 Oak Ridge Drive
The Woodlands, TX 77380
Represented By
Julie Mitchell Koenig
Cooper & Scully, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Saturday, March 05, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/05 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
22 22 order Dismissing Adversary Case Thu 03/03 10:55 AM
Order of Dismissal Signed on 3/2/2016 (aalo)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss Party Wed 03/02 10:08 AM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Party Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners, acting for itself and on behalf of Royalty Partners Investment Fund I, LP . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Rodney Tow (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 12, 2016
20 20 misc Response Fri 02/12 5:01 PM
Response (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Case
Thursday, January 28, 2016
19 19 motion Extend Time Thu 01/28 4:29 PM
Motion to Extend Time /Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Filed by Rodney Tow (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/13 7:38 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners (Scannell, Thomas)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Wed 01/13 7:30 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause FRCP 12(b)(6), 9(b) . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Defendant Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners (Scannell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
16 16 misc Response Mon 01/11 12:34 PM
Response (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/30 4:12 PM
First Amended Complaint Related [+] (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 17, 2015
14 14 misc Certificate Thu 12/17 3:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Ownership (Filed By Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners, Royalty Partner Investment Fund I, L.P. ). (Scannell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
13 13 motion Extend Time Wed 12/16 4:53 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by Rodney Tow (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 11, 2015
12 12 misc Jury Demand Fri 12/11 1:35 PM
Jury Demand (Filed By Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners, Royalty Partner Investment Fund I, L.P. ). (Melko, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/11 1:33 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners, Royalty Partner Investment Fund I, L.P. (Melko, John)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Complaint
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/11 1:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners, Royalty Partner Investment Fund I, L.P. (Melko, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/20 3:36 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+] (Lindstrom, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/19 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 11/18/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fees
Monday, November 16, 2015
7 7 court Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fees Mon 11/16 11:29 AM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fees. The court may dismiss this case after 15 days unless the filing fee is paid or a party in interest requests a hearing (agou)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/07 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, November 05, 2015
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/06 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
4 4 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Wed 11/04 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
3 3 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Tue 11/03 10:44 AM
Initial Scheduling Order Signed on 11/3/2015 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/11/2016 at 02:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). Pre-Trial Order due by 3/28/2016. Discovery due by 3/11/2016. (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 answer Response Tue 11/03 10:38 AM
Response to Claim Objection . Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners (aalo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 11/03 10:36 AM
Adversary case 15-06020 Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint by Rodney Tow against Ad Hoc Group of Limited Partners . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (aalo)
Related: [-]