Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:12-cv-00968
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2012
Terminated:Aug 23, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 8:09 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Jonathan I. Blackman
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Christopher P. Moore
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Exchange Bondholder Group
Represented By
Sean F. O'Shea
O'Shea Partners LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Fintech Advisory Inc.
Represented By
William Francis Dahill
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Movant
Montreux Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Walter Rieman
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Movant
Wilton Capital
Represented By
Walter Rieman
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Movant
Kenneth W. Dam
Represented By
Kevin S. Reed
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason J. Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert LLP
contact info
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 26 2012
OPINION, affirming in part and remanding in part, by RSP., BDP., RR., FILED.[757688] [12-105, 12-109, 12-111, 12-157, 12-158, 12-163, 12-164, 12-170, 12-176, 12-185, 12-189, 12-214, 12-909, 12-914, 12-916, 12-919, 12-920, 12-923, 12-924, 12-926, 12-939, 12-943, 12-951, 12-968, 12-971]
GPO Aug 23 2013
OPINION, affirming orders of the district court as amended, by RSP, BDP, RR, FILED.[1024537] [12-909, 12-914, 12-916, 12-919, 12-920, 12-923, 12-924, 12-926, 12-939, 12-943, 12-951, 12-968, 12-971, 12-4829]

Docket last updated: 01/13/2016 7:19 AM EST
Wednesday, March 07, 2012
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [550311] [12-968] [Entered: 03/13/2012 10:33 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, district court receipt # 02087259078, FILED.[550315] [12-968] [Entered: 03/13/2012 10:37 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/23/2012, RECEIVED.[550317] [12-968] [Entered: 03/13/2012 10:39 AM]
Related: [-]