Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:15-ap-01438
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2015
Terminated:Apr 21, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Textile Company
Represented By
American Textile Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna's Linens, Inc.
Represented By
Irving M Gross
Levene, Neale, Bender Et Al.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, April 21, 2017
44 44 court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/21 3:00 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1438 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
43 43 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/20 2:52 PM
Hearing Held RE; COMPLAINT; Related [+] VACATED; OFF CALENDAR;NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING BY PLAINTIFF WITH PREJUDICE FILED 3/9/17 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] ument1
42 42 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/20 10:20 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] - VACATED; OFF CALENDAR; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING BY PLAINTIFF WITH PREJUDICE FILED 3/9/17(Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, March 09, 2017
41 41 notice Notice Thu 03/09 4:27 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding by Plaintiff with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:15-ap-01438. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against American Textile Company. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015. filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, February 09, 2017
40 40 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/09 5:52 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] (holding date) Minier will give notice. CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, January 26, 2017
39 39 misc Status report Thu 01/26 2:54 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
38 38 notice Notice Wed 01/25 4:11 PM
Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:15-ap-01438. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against American Textile Company. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015. filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc., 37 STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.) Status hearing to be held on 2/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 9, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ATTORNEY MINIER TO GIVE NOTICE
Thursday, December 15, 2016
37 37 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 12/16 3:38 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 9, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ATTORNEY MINIER TO GIVE NOTICE (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Friday, December 02, 2016
36 36 misc Status report Fri 12/02 12:56 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 10, 2016
35 35 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 11/14 6:36 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/15/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO EXTEND RESPONSE DATE TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 10-25-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, October 27, 2016
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/27 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
33 33 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 10/25 2:52 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Extend Response Date To Complaint And Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 30, 2016; AND 3. THE STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHALL BE, AND HEREBY IS, CONTINUED FROM NOVEMBER 10:00 A.M., TO DECEMBER 15, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED COURT. Signed on 10/25/2016 Related [+]. (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 32 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
32 32 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 10/12 4:17 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
31 31 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 10/03 5:38 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Continued to 11-10-16 at 10:00 AM per Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint and Continue Status Conference Entered 9-8-16. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Saturday, September 10, 2016
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 09/10 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, September 08, 2016
29 29 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 09/08 3:10 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Extend Response Date To Complaint And Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED FROM SEPTEMBER 29, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. TO NOVEMBER 10, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M., RM 5B - PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING Signed on 9/8/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 28
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
28 28 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 09/07 1:13 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
27 27 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 07/28 5:45 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ENTERED 7/15/16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Sunday, July 17, 2016
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 07/17 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Friday, July 15, 2016
25 25 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Fri 07/15 11:59 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint To and Including September 15, 2016 and Continue Status Conference from July 28, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to September 29, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 5B. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/15/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, July 11, 2016
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 07/11 1:44 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 06/27 10:36 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ENTERED (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, May 12, 2016
22 22 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 05/17 10:30 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 1) TIME TO RESPOND AND 2) INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 3-4-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Monday, May 02, 2016
21 21 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 05/02 11:50 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Naylor, Karen. (Naylor, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/28 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 04/26 2:39 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Extend Response Date To Complaint And Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE DEADLINE, AS THAT TERM IS DEFINED IN THE STIPULATION IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JULY 11, 2016 AND 3. THE STATUS CONFERENCE AS THAT TERM IS DEFINED IN THE STIPULATION, IS CONTINUED TO JULY 28, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED COURT. Signed on 4/26/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, April 22, 2016
18 18 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 04/22 12:53 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Response Date to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Nelson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 04/01 3:32 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE RE COMPLAINT Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION ENTEREED 2/24/16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Sunday, March 06, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/06 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, March 04, 2016
15 15 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 03/04 5:39 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue 1) Time To Respond and 2) Initial Status Conference Related [+] - HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING MAY 12, 2016 AND 3. THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED FROM MAY 12, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. TO JUNE 23, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. - IT IS SO ORDERED Signed on 3/4/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, March 03, 2016
14 14 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 03/03 3:17 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and American Textile Company -[Stipulation to Continue (1) Time To Respond, and (2) Initial STatus Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/26 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
12 12 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/24 2:24 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation to Continue 1) Time to Respond, and 2) Initial Status Conference from March 31, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to May 12, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., 411 W. Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/24/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, February 18, 2016
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 02/18 3:25 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and American Textile Company -[ Second Stipulation to Continue 1) Time to Respond, and 2) Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/04 3:20 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/31/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 1) TIME TO RESPOND AND 2) INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 1-26-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Friday, January 29, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/29 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 01/26 6:05 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue 1) Time To Respond and 2) Initial Status Conference Granting X-Order (Generic) Related [+] - HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 24, 2016; 3. THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED FROM FEBRUARY 4, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. TO MARCH 31, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.; IT IS SO ORDERED Signed on 1/26/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, January 22, 2016
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 01/22 3:50 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and American Textile Company (Stipulation to Continue (1) Time to Respond, and (2) Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- ). (Fritz, John-Patrick
6 6 misc Status report Fri 01/22 2:45 PM
Status report -[Joint Status Report (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
5 5 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 01/20 1:35 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and American Textile Company (Stipulation to Continue (1) Time to Respond, and (2) Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Fri 11/20 2:21 PM
Notice -[Notice Of Required Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed on American Textile Company 11/20/2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 11/20 2:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on American Textile Company 11/20/2015 (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/18 2:25 PM
Summons Issued on American Textile Company Date Issued 11/18/2015, Answer Due 12/18/2015 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/4/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/17 4:57 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01438. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against American Textile Company. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015 (Daniels, Sally).
Related: [-]