Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:15-ap-01443
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2015
Terminated:May 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ginsey Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Ginsey Industries, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna's Linens, Inc.
Represented By
Irving M Gross
Levene, Neale, Bender Et Al.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
35 35 court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/02 10:18 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1443 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
34 34 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/20 4:51 PM
Hearing Held RE: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE RE: Complaint for: (1) Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers [11 USC Sections 547(b), 550(a), and 551]; and (2) Disallowance of Any Claims Held by Defendant [11 USC Section 502(d)](set at s/c held on 9-29-16)(con't from 2-9-17 as a holding date)OFFF CALENDAR; ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE ENTERED 4/11/17(Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/13 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
32 32 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/11 3:38 PM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice - APPROVED. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/11/2017 Related [+]. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.,7 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
31 31 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 04/11 10:27 AM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
30 30 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/09 5:55 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] (holding date) Minier will give notice. CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Saturday, October 15, 2016
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 10/15 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/15/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, October 13, 2016
28 28 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 10/13 4:59 PM
Scheduling Order in Adversary Proceeding - (1) The deadline for parties to complete discovery shall be January 31, 2017; (2) The deadline for the parties to file pre-trial motions shall be January 30, 2017; and (3) A pre-trial conference shall be held in this adversary proceeding on February 9, 2017, at 10:00 am, in Courtroom 5B (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/13/2016 Related [+]. (see order for further ruling) (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, September 29, 2016
27 27 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 10/03 5:41 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Deadline for completing discovery: January 31, 2017, Last date for filing pre-trial motions: January 30, 2017, Pre-trial conference on: February 9, 2017 at 10:00 am. Joint pre-trial order due per local rules. Plaintiff to lodge scheduling order. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/28 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 26, 2016
25 25 order Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/26 3:47 PM
Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney [Brian J. Jackiw , Goldstein & Mcclintock LLP, 208 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1750, Chicago, Illniois, 60604 to Appear in a Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)] (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/26/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
24 24 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Wed 09/21 1:03 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)] Filed by Defendant Ginsey Industries, Inc. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
23 23 misc Status report Thu 09/15 1:26 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
22 22 answer Opposition Tue 09/13 4:31 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for: (1) Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers [11 U.S.C. §§ 547(b), and 550]; and (2) Disallowance of Any Claims Held by Defendant [11 U.S.C. § 502(d)] Filed by Defendant Ginsey Industries, Inc. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, August 11, 2016
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 08/16 4:06 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO 9-29-16 AT 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 6-28-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, June 30, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 06/30 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
19 19 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 06/28 10:39 AM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Extend Deadline To Respond To Complaint And To Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - ORDER THAT: (1) THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED: (2) THE STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHALL BE, AND HEREBY IS, CONTINUED FROM AUGUST 11, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. TO SEPTEMBER 29, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. AND (3) DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE TO, AND INCLUDING, AUGUST 25, 2016 TO FILE SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Signed on 6/28/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, June 27, 2016
18 18 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 06/27 11:29 AM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 06/27 10:47 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER ON STIPULATION ENTERED 5/13/16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Sunday, May 15, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/15 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/15/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 13, 2016
14 14 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Fri 05/13 4:50 PM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference from June 23, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to August 11, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 5B, 411 W. Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Defendant Shall Have to and Including, June 27, 2016, to File and Serve a Response to the Complaint in this Adversary Proceeding. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/13/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 05/13 12:19 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
16 16 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 05/17 10:36 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ENTERED 3/22/16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Monday, May 02, 2016
12 12 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 05/02 12:00 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Naylor, Karen. (Naylor, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
11 11 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 04/22 4:23 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Sanders, Nanette. (Sanders, Nanette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/24 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
9 9 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Tue 03/22 5:04 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue 1) Time to Respond through and including May 12, 2016, and 2) Initial Status Conference from May 12, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to June 23, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/22/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 03/22 1:06 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc. and Ginsey Industries, Inc. -[Stipulation To Continue 1) Time To Respond, And 2) Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/17 5:43 PM
Notice of Hearing -[Notice Of Continued Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/04 3:32 PM
Hearing Continued - STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO MAY 12, 2106 AT 10:00 AM. ATTORNEY FRITZ TO GIVE NOTICE (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
5 5 misc Status report Tue 02/02 2:17 PM
Status report -[Unilateral Status Report (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 20, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Fri 11/20 2:32 PM
Notice -[Notice Of Required Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed on Ginsey Industries, Inc. 11/20/2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 11/20 2:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ginsey Industries, Inc. 11/20/2015 (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/18 3:55 PM
Summons Issued on Ginsey Industries, Inc. Date Issued 11/18/2015, Answer Due 12/18/2015 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/4/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/17 5:27 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01443. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against Ginsey Industries, Inc.. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. -[Complaint For: (1) Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers [11 U.S.C. §§ 547(B), 550(A), And 551]; And (2) Disallowance Of Any Claims Held By Defendant [11 U.S.C. § 502(D)] (Adversary Proceeding Cover Page attached)]- Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015 (Daniels, Sally).
Related: [-]