Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:15-ap-01444
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2015
Terminated:Jul 27, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Glenoit LLC
Represented By
Glenoit LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna's Linens, Inc.
Represented By
Irving M Gross
Levene, Neale, Bender Et Al.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
41 41 notice Notice Wed 06/20 4:39 PM
Notice of Request to be Removed From Electronic Mailing List Filed by Defendant Glenoit LLC, Counter-Claimant Glenoit LLC. (Doolittle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
40 40 court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/27 2:36 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1444 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 06/30 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, June 29, 2017
38 38 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 06/29 5:17 PM
Hearing Held - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE RE: Complaint for: (1) Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers [11 USC Sections 547(b), 550(a), and 551]; and (2) Disallowance of Any Claims Held by Defendant [11 USC Section 502(d)] - OFF CALENDAR; ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE ENTERED 6/28/17 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
37 37 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 06/28 1:16 PM
ORDER on Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with prejudice (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/28/2017 Related [+]. (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc., Hearing (Adv Other) Continued,30 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
36 36 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 06/28 9:53 AM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
35 35 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 03/23 5:33 PM
Hearing Continued PER STIPULATION/ORDER ENTERED 3/16/17 Related [+] CONTINUED Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Saturday, March 18, 2017
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 03/18 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, March 16, 2017
33 33 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 03/16 1:33 PM
Order on stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant to continue pre-trial conference - CONTINUED TO June 29, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/16/2017 (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 32
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
32 32 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 03/14 2:39 PM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/20 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
30 30 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/18 3:32 PM
Scheduling Order In Adversary Proceeding. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/18/2016. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert Pre-Trial Order due by 2/15/2017. Discovery due by 2/20/2017. The deadline for the parties to file pre-trial motions shall be March 16, 2017. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
29 29 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 10/11 4:01 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding re: Complaint For: (1) Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers [11 U.S.C. §§ 547(b), 550(a), And 551]; And (2) Disallowance Of Any Claims Held By Defendant [11 U.S.C. § 502(d)] Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:15-ap-01444. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against Glenoit LLC. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. -[Complaint For: (1) Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers [11 U.S.C. §§ 547(B), 550(A), And 551]; And (2) Disallowance Of Any Claims Held By Defendant [11 U.S.C. § 502(D)] (Adversary Proceeding Cover Page attached)]- Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015. filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, October 06, 2016
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 10/06 3:06 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING DISCOVERY: FEBRUARY 20,2017; LAST DATE FOR FILING PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS: MARCH 6, 2017; CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE to be held on 03/23/2017 at 10:00 AM Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg 411 W Fourth St Crtrm 5B Santa Ana, CA 92701, JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER DUE PER LOCAL RULES. MINIER TO LODGE A SCHEDULING ORDER. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, September 22, 2016
28 28 misc Status report Thu 09/22 2:04 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 11, 2016
27 27 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 08/16 4:09 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/6/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 8-2-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, August 04, 2016
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 08/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
25 25 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 08/02 9:42 AM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Continue Status Conference From 8/11/16 at 10: 00 A.M. To 10/6/16 at 10:00 A.M., Rm 5B (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/2/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, July 29, 2016
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 07/29 11:19 AM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 06/27 10:50 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE 6-14-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Thursday, June 16, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 06/16 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
21 21 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 06/14 4:43 PM
Order on Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Status Conference - The status conference in this adversary proceeding shall be, and hereby is, continued from June 23, 2016 at 10:00 am, to August 11, 2016, at 10:00 am (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/14/2016 (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, June 10, 2016
20 20 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 06/10 11:31 AM
Stipulation By KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE and Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
19 19 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 05/17 10:37 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ENTERED 3/23/16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
18 18 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 05/12 2:16 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Answer of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant to Counterclaim Filed by KAREN SUE NAYLOR, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
17 17 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 05/02 12:01 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Naylor, Karen. (Naylor, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
16 16 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 04/22 4:25 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Sanders, Nanette. (Sanders, Nanette)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/25 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
14 14 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Wed 03/23 10:57 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference from May 12, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to June 23, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., 411 W. Fourth St., Courtroom 5B, Santa Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/23/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
13 13 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 03/08 9:59 AM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc., Anna's Linens, Inc. and Glenoit LLC -[Stipulation To Continue Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc., Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 02/04 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 02/04 3:35 PM
Hearing Continued STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 2-2-16 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc., Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 02/02 5:24 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+] - HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A REPLY TO THE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS SHALL BE EXTENDED TO MARCH 31, 2016; 3. THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED FROM FEBRUARY 4, 2016 TO MAY 12, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. - IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 2/2/2016 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, January 29, 2016
9 9 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 01/29 2:25 PM
Stipulation By Anna's Linens, Inc., Anna's Linens, Inc. and Glenoit LLC -[Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference (POS Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc., Counter-Defendant Anna's Linens, Inc. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
8 8 misc Proof of service Wed 12/23 2:51 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Glenoit LLC, Counter-Claimant Glenoit LLC Related [+]. (Doolittle, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
7 7 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 12/22 3:19 PM
Answer to Complaint And , Counterclaim by Glenoit LLC against Anna's Linens, Inc. - Amended - Filed by Glenoit LLC. (Doolittle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 12/21 3:30 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE PDF IS NOT PROPERLY FORMATTED WITH COUNTER-CLAIMANT AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO CORRECT AND RE-FILE THE COUNTERCLAIM (NOTATING IT IS AMENDED) TO REFLECT THE PROPER FORMAT. Related [+] (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Counter-Claimant Glenoit LLC, Defendant Glenoit LLC, Counterclaim
Friday, December 18, 2015
5 5 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 12/18 12:18 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Glenoit LLC against Anna's Linens, Inc. Filed by Glenoit LLC. (Doolittle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Fri 11/20 2:51 PM
Notice -[Notice Of Required Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 (Pos Attached)]- Filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc. Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed on Glenoit LLC 11/20/2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 11/20 2:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Glenoit LLC 11/20/2015 (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/18 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on Glenoit LLC Date Issued 11/18/2015, Answer Due 12/18/2015 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/4/2016 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anna's Linens, Inc.
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/17 5:30 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01444. Complaint by Anna's Linens, Inc. against Glenoit LLC. (Charge To Estate) Fee Amount $350. -[Complaint For: (1) Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers [11 U.S.C. §§ 547(B), 550(A), And 551]; And (2) Disallowance Of Any Claims Held By Defendant [11 U.S.C. § 502(D)] (Adversary Proceeding Cover Page attached)]- Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Gross, Irving) Modified on 11/18/2015 (Daniels, Sally).
Related: [-]