Hercules Offshore, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11385 |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 15, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Debtor
Hercules Offshore, Inc.
9 Greenway Plz Ste 2200
Houston, TX 77046-0931 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Christopher S Sontchi
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
1. | Hercules Offshore Returns to Chapter 11 Bankruptcy due to ongoing decline in oil prices (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/06/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 01/21 9:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH) |