Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10109

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:16-ap-01053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
NBCN, Inc., Defendant
Represented By
NBCN, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow, Plaintiff
1602 E. Cesar Chavez Street
Austin, TX 78702
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/31 9:52 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
8 8 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 01/27 12:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant, NBCN, Inc. filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff Randolph N Osherow (Mercer, Kell) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01053 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against NBCN, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
7 7 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 11/08 7:49 AM
Summons Served on NBCN, Inc. - served on 8/1/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
6 6 court Event with PDF (Adversary) Wed 08/31 12:27 PM
Court Entry: Letter Acknowledge of Receipt of Summons, Complaint and Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet By Creditor NBCN (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 13, 2016
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/13 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Obtain Summons Service on Randolph Osherow (Order entered on 8/11/2016)
Thursday, August 11, 2016
4 4 order AP-Obtain Summons Service (F) Thu 08/11 9:48 AM
Order to Obtain Summons Service on Randolph Osherow (Order entered on 8/11/2016) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:42 PM
Summons Issued on NBCN, Inc. Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:42 PM
Summons Issued on NBCN, Inc. Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 12:42 PM
Adversary case 16-01053 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against NBCN, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 06/28 1:17 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 16-01053 hcm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 17226735 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1