Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:15-bk-10109
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Mar 27, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 27, 2015
Terminated:Feb 05, 2019

Debtor
Cointerra, Inc.
11130 Jollyville Rd Ste 303
Austin, TX 78759-5593
Represented By
Timothy A. Davidson, II
Andrews & Kurth L.L.P.
contact info
Joseph P. Rovira
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Steve Turner
Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel
contact info


1. Bitcoin Mining Firm CoinTerra Files for Chapter 7 Bankruptcy (coindesk.com)
Submitted Wed 01/28/2015
Docket last updated: 01/25/2015 6:00 PM CST
Saturday, January 24, 2015
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 15-10109 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00), Amount $ 335.00, Receipt 15536140 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 335) Filed By Cointerra, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 02/2/2015 (Davidson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Randolph N Osherow, added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/27/2015 at 10:00 AM at Austin Room 118. (Davidson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Timothy A. Davidson IIfor Debtor Cointerra, Inc.. (Davidson, Timothy)
Related: [-]