Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10109

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:16-ap-01054
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Jul 27, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paladuro Investments, LLC, Defendant
2530 Eldorado Parkway, Suite 100
Mckinney, TX 75070
Represented By
Paladuro Investments, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow, Plaintiff
1602 E. Cesar Chavez Street
Austin, TX 78702
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/27 3:41 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
4 4 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 07/12 10:22 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint Against Paladuro Investments, LLC filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (Mercer, Kell) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01054 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paladuro Investments, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:49 PM
Summons Issued on Paladuro Investments, LLC Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:48 PM
Summons Issued on Paladuro Investments, LLC Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 12:48 PM
Adversary case 16-01054 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paladuro Investments, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 06/28 1:17 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 16-01054 hcm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 17226735 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1