Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10109

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:16-ap-01056
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Jan 12, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Massive Networks, Inc., Defendant
382 S. Arthur Ave.
Louisville, CO 80027
Represented By
Massive Networks, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow, Plaintiff
1602 E. Cesar Chavez Street
Austin, TX 78702
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, January 12, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/12 10:43 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/11 3:31 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kell C. Mercer for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc., Plaintiff Randolph N. Osherow (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 29, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/29 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Allowing Extension of Time(related document(s):15 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sprouse, Marvin) (related document(s):9 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).) Docket Call Set For 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/10/2016, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/30/2016, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/21/2016 . (Order entered on 8/12/2016)) Modified on 10/25/2016 To Delete Extra Text.) ,. (Order entered on 10/27/2016)
Friday, October 28, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/28 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Allowing Withdrawal or Substitution of Attorney (related document(s):14 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Attorney Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 10/26/2016)
Thursday, October 27, 2016
17 17 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Thu 10/27 1:06 PM
Order Allowing Extension of Tim Related [+] ,. (Order entered on 10/27/2016) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 15 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sprouse, Marvin) (related document(s):9 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).) Docket Call Set For 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/10/2016, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/30/2016, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/21/2016 . (Order entered on 8/12/2016)) Modified on 10/25/2016 To Delete Extra Text.
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Thu 10/27 4:11 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 2/1/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 2/22/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 2/6/2017. (Benitez, Estella) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
16 16 order AP-Withdraw or Substitute Attorney (PDF) Wed 10/26 4:51 PM
Order Allowing Withdrawal or Substitution of Attorney Related [+] (Order entered on 10/26/2016) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 14 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Attorney Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Friday, October 21, 2016
15 15 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 10/21 4:35 PM
Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Sprouse, Marvin) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).) Docket Call Set For 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/10/2016, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/30/2016, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/21/2016 . (Order entered on 8/12/2016)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 motion Withdraw or Substitute Attorney (Adversary) Fri 10/21 3:31 PM
Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Attorney Filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc.. (Sprouse, Marvin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
13 13 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 08/24 6:02 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Marvin E. Sprouse III for Defendant Massive Networks, Inc. (Sprouse, Marvin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/14 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/14/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 8/12/2016)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/14 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/14/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).) Docket Call Set For 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/10/2016, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/30/2016, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/21/2016 . (Order entered on 8/12/2016)
Friday, August 12, 2016
10 10 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Fri 08/12 5:35 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 8/12/2016) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
9 9 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Fri 08/12 10:52 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/10/2016, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/30/2016, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/21/2016 . (Order entered on 8/12/2016) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/10 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Requiring Massive Networks, Inc To Retain Attorney and File Amended Answer (related document(s):4 Answer to Complaint filed by Massive Networks, Inc.) (Order entered on 8/8/2016)
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/10 7:29 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Massive Networks, Inc., (Sprouse, Marvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
6 6 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 08/08 8:00 AM
Order Requiring Massive Networks, Inc To Retain Attorney and File Amended Answer Related [+] (Order entered on 8/8/2016) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Massive Networks, Inc.
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
5 5 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 08/03 1:55 PM
Summons Served on Massive Networks, Inc. - served on 7/1/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/02 12:38 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Massive Networks, Inc., (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:58 PM
Summons Issued on Massive Networks, Inc. Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 06/28 12:57 PM
Summons Issued on Massive Networks, Inc. Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 12:57 PM
Adversary case 16-01056 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Massive Networks, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 06/28 1:17 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 16-01056 hcm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 17226735 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1