Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10109

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:16-ap-01059
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Aug 30, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC, Defendant
12303 Technology Blvd., Ste. 925
Austin, TX 78727
Represented By
Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow, Plaintiff
1602 E. Cesar Chavez Street
Austin, TX 78702
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, September 01, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing Adversary Case With Prejudice (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-01059 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).) (Order entered on 8/30/2016)
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
8 8 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Tue 08/30 8:04 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case With Prejudice Related [+] (Order entered on 8/30/2016) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01059 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/30 8:05 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
7 7 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 08/17 8:04 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Claims Against Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC filed by Kell C. Mercer for Plaintiff Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (Mercer, Kell) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01059 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))).
Saturday, August 13, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/13 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Randolph Osherow to Seek Default against Ascendent Engineering Solutions, LLC . Default Judgment Motion due by 9/12/2016 (Order entered on 8/11/2016)
Thursday, August 11, 2016
5 5 order AP-Seek Default (F) Thu 08/11 9:54 AM
Order for Randolph Osherow to Seek Default against Ascendent Engineering Solutions, LLC . Default Judgment Motion due by 9/12/2016 (Order entered on 8/11/2016) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 08/03 1:56 PM
Summons Served on Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC - served on 6/30/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 06/28 1:15 PM
Summons Issued on Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 06/28 1:14 PM
Summons Issued on Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC Answer Due 07/28/2016 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 1:14 PM
Adversary case 16-01059 Complaint filed by Randolph N. (as Chapter 7 Trustee) Osherow (attorney Kell C. Mercer) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Ascendant Engineering Solutions, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 06/28 1:17 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 16-01059 hcm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 17226735 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1