Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-51834

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:16-ap-05067
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2016
Terminated:Jul 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jim Weynand
610 Market St., Unit 3216
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Jim Weynand
contact info
Plaintiff
Olmos Equipment Inc.
PO Box 769020
San Antonio, TX 78245
Represented By
Eric Terry
Eric Terry Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Sunday, July 30, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/30 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Agreed Judgment (related document(s):12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .) (Order entered on 7/3/2017)) (Order entered on 7/28/2017)
Friday, July 28, 2017
17 17 order AP-Amended Order (PDF) Fri 07/28 10:03 AM
Amended Agreed Judgment Related [+] (Order entered on 7/28/2017) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .) (Order entered on 7/3/2017)
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/26 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting (related document(s):14 Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric Terry, William B. Kingman for Plaintiff Olmos Equipment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kingman, William) (related document(s):12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016.) (Order entered on 7/3/2017))) (Order entered on 7/24/2017)
Monday, July 24, 2017
15 15 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 07/24 3:23 PM
Order Granting Related [+] (Order entered on 7/24/2017) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 14 Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric Terry, William B. Kingman for Plaintiff Olmos Equipment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kingman, William) (related document(s):12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016.) (Order entered on 7/3/2017))
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
14 14 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Tue 07/18 4:56 PM
Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric Terry, William B. Kingman for Plaintiff Olmos Equipment Inc.. (Kingman, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016.) (Order entered on 7/3/2017)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/05 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .) (Order entered on 7/3/2017)
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/05 11:49 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
12 12 order AP-Judgment (PDF) Mon 07/03 5:39 PM
AGREED Judgment (WITH PREJUDICE) Related [+] (Order entered on 7/3/2017) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .
Saturday, March 25, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/25 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Due Letter Sent to: William Kingham (related document(s):1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .) Overdue Order Due By 4/13/2017
Thursday, March 23, 2017
10 10 court Letter-Order Due (F) (Adversary) Thu 03/23 3:16 PM
Order Due Letter Sent to: William Kingham Related [+] Overdue Order Due By 4/13/2017 (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .
Monday, March 06, 2017
court Docket Call Held (Adversary) Mon 03/06 2:45 PM
Docket Call Held. ***AGREED JUDGMENT*** . Agreed Judgment Due to be filed by William Kingman Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). (Attachments: #1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016.) Order due by 3/20/2017 (Castleberry, Deanna
Monday, October 17, 2016
9 9 misc Statement Regarding Consent Mon 10/17 3:02 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Ryan C. Reed for Defendant Jim Weynand Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Ryan
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
8 8 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 10/12 9:13 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Eric Terry for Plaintiff Olmos Equipment Inc. (Terry, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
7 7 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 10/03 3:31 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 3/6/2017 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 1/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 2/27/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/11/2017. (Order entered on 10/3/2016) (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint Against Jim Weynand filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Terry, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2016 .
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/28 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 9/26/2016)
Monday, September 26, 2016
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Mon 09/26 1:53 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 9/26/2016) (Rodriguez, Vidal)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/23 3:42 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jim Weynand, Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Ryan
Thursday, August 25, 2016
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Thu 08/25 1:36 PM
Summons Served on Jim Weynand - served on 8/25/2016 (Terry, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 08/24 5:30 PM
Summons Issued on Jim Weynand Answer Due 09/23/2016 (Terry, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/24 5:30 PM
Adversary case 16-05067 Complaint filed by Olmos Equipment Inc. (attorney Eric Terry) against Jim Weynand (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))). (Terry, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Wed 08/24 5:31 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 16-05067 cag) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 17411824 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1