Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:16-bk-51834
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Sep 12, 2016
Claims Deadline:Dec 12, 2016
Terminated:Jan 09, 2020
Plan Confirmed:May 01, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Olmos Equipment Inc.
PO Box 769020
San Antonio, TX 78245-9020
Represented By
William B. Kingman
contact info
Eric Terry
Eric Terry Law, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
356 356 misc ~Document Tue 01/21 9:42 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending December 2019 filed by William B. Kingman for Debtor Olmos Equipment Inc.. (Kingman, William)
Related: [-]