Modular Space Holdings, Inc., et al.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12825 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Modular Space Holdings, Inc., et al.
1200 Swedesford Road
Berwyn, PA 19312 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Modular Space Holdings, Inc.
1200 W Swedesford Rd
Berwyn, PA 19312-1172 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:16 PM EST |
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nueces County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garland ISD
1919 S Shiloh Rd, Ste 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris Co WCID #21
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Highland Park ISD
500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hillsborough County Tax Collector, State of Florida
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Irving ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jackson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Louisiana Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Counsel, Collection Division 617 N. Third St., Office 780 (Zip 70802) P.O. Box 66658
Baton Rouge, LA 70896 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
222 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mark Line Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P. O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prince Georges County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Avenue, Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richardson ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spring Branch Independent School District, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Town of Highland Park
500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. National Leasing LLC
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Valwood Improvement Authority
500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Victoria County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Capital Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Window Technology, Inc.
Lathrop & Gage LLP 910 East St. Louis, Suite 100
Springfield, MO 65810 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clear Brook City MUD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CIT Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Broadmont Associates
259 . Meyer Ave.
Tucson, AZ 85701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brandywine Grande B, L.P.
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bexar County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charles County, Maryland
M. Evan Meyers 6801 Kenilworth Avenue, Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Garland
1919 S Shiloh Rd Suite 310, LB 40
Garland, TX, TX 75042 |
|
Creditor
City of University Park
500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DCURD
500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Element Financial Corporation, Element Vehicle Management Services, LLC f/k/a PHH Vehicle Management Services, LLC and Gelco Corporation d/b/a GE Fleet
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ABC Supply Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Equipment Depot, Ltd.
Scheef & Stone LLP 500 N. Akard, Ste. 2700
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend Co WCID #02
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77088 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Atascosa County
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Flagler County Tax Collector
|
|
Interested Party
Vanderburgh County Treasurer
Room #210 Civic Center Complex 1 NW Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd.
Evansville, IN 47708 |
|
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A., as First Lien Agent and DIP Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Noteholder Group
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brevard County Tax Collector
Joe Milliken P.O. Box 2500
Titusville, FL 32781 |
|
Interested Party
Town of Belmont
|
|
Interested Party
White Construction Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ken Burton, Jr.
|
|
Interested Party
Renova Environmental Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Calera Entities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Porter County Treasurer
|
|
Interested Party
Pearsall ISD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Capital One Business Credit Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mecklenburg County Treasurers Office
|
|
Interested Party
Dilley ISD
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Indian River County Tax Collector
|
|
Interested Party
Element Financial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Element Vehicle Management Services, LLC f/k/a PHH Vehicle Management Services,
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gelco Corporation d/b/a GE Fleet Services
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Modular Space Files for Bankruptcy in U.S. and Canada to eliminate $400M in debt (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/22/2016 | |